Greenwald v. United States of America
South Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Karen E Schreier |
Referred: | Veronica L Duffy |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-04069 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 11/27 3:09 PM
MANDATE from 8th Circuit COA issued as to41 Notice of Appeal filed by Shelia Lavonne Greenwald. (SAC) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
appeal
USCA Judgment
Thu 10/03 4:20 PM
JUDGMENT of USCA denying application for certificate of appealability as to41 Notice of Appeal filed by Shelia Lavonne Greenwald. (TAL) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Letter Sent
Wed 07/24 12:37 PM
Appeal Record Sent by Clerk's Office to Scott Lewandoski as to underlying criminal case 4:16-cr-40032-06. (KLE) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)
Thu 05/23 9:03 AM
ORDER of USCA directing Clerk of the District Court to forward portions of the original record not available in an electronic format through PACER to USCA within 10 days re41 Notice of Appeal filed by Shelia Lavonne Greenwald. (SAC) |
|
43 | 43
appeal
USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule
Thu 05/23 9:03 AM
USCA Case Number for41 Notice of Appeal filed by Shelia Lavonne Greenwald. USCA Case Number: 19-2039 (SAC) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA
Mon 05/20 11:20 AM
TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re41 Notice of Appeal. (DLC) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 05/20 10:46 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to40 Judgment, by Shelia Lavonne Greenwald.. (DLC) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support in Motion to Appeal | ||
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
order
Judgment
Fri 03/15 5:05 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Shelia Lavonne Greenwald. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on March 15, 2019. Sent to Sheila Lavonne Greenwald along with Post Conviction Appeal Packet via U.S. Postal Service (DLC) |
|
39 | 39
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 03/15 5:01 PM
ORDER adopting35 Report and Recommendation; adopting36 Report and Recommendation; granting22 Motion to Dismiss; denying a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on March 15, 2019. Sent to Sheila Lavonne Greenwald via U.S. Postal Service (DLC) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice
Fri 02/22 4:14 PM
NOTICE by United States of America of No Objection to the Court's Report and Recommendation . (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 02/14 3:20 PM
**REDACTED** REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255),22 MOTION to DISMISS Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence. Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 2/14/2019. (CG) Modified on 2/14/2019 (KLE) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 02/14 2:12 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255),22 MOTION to DISMISS Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on February 14, 2019. (DLC) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
respoth
Response
Fri 02/08 12:06 PM
RESPONSE to21 United States Answer to Petitioners 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion filed by Shelia Lavonne Greenwald. (DLC) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Thu 12/06 10:41 AM
TEXT ORDER granting32 Motion to Continue. Movant's brief shall be due by February 1, 2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 12/6/2018. (CG) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Continue
Tue 12/04 3:00 PM
MOTION to Continue Response Deadline by Shelia Lavonne Greenwald. (DLC) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Fri 10/26 9:31 AM
ORDER granting movant Greenwald's30 Motion to Extend. Ms. Greenwald shall file her response to the government's motion to dismiss on or before December 3, 2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/26/18. (Duffy, Veronica) |
|
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extend
Thu 10/25 3:22 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Counsel and Government Responses by Shelia Lavonne Greenwald. (DLC) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)
Wed 10/10 5:03 PM
SEALED Memorandum In Support re22 MOTION to DISMISS Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence . (SLW) |
|
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal Document Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document
Wed 10/10 4:50 PM
ORDER terminating24 Motion to Seal Document; granting26 Motion to Seal Existing Document. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/10/18. (SLW) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Wed 10/10 2:33 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part movant Shelia Greenwald's25 Motion to Compel. The clerk of court's office is directed to provide Ms. Greenwald with copies of the transcripts of her change of plea and sentencing hearings from her underlying criminal case. The motion is denied in all other respects. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10-10-18. (Duffy, Veronica) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Seal Existing Document
Wed 10/10 12:41 PM
Amended MOTION to Seal Existing Document23 Memorandum in Support of Motion,24 MOTION to Seal Document by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Compel
Tue 10/09 2:56 PM
MOTION to Compel by Shelia Lavonne Greenwald. (SLW) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope postmarked 10/3/18 | ||
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)
Tue 10/09 8:29 AM
MOTION to Seal Document by United States of America. (SLW) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Sealed Document | ||
23 | 23
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 10/05 3:40 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re22 MOTION to DISMISS Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence and Answer filed by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss
Fri 10/05 3:39 PM
MOTION to DISMISS Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
21 | 21
respoth
Response
Fri 10/05 3:37 PM
RESPONSE to1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 09/18 12:46 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States of America answer due 10/5/2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 09/18/18. (Duffy, Veronica) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 09/18 12:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines
Fri 09/14 10:51 AM
ORDER denying as moot movant Greenwald's17 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Respondent the United States of America has not presently filed anything which requires a response from Ms. Greenwald. When the government files a motion, Ms. Greenwald will have 24 days from the date the motion was filed with the court to file her response. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 09/14/18. (Duffy, Veronica) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extend Deadlines
Thu 09/13 3:59 PM
MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Shelia Lavonne Greenwald. (JLS) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope postmarked 9-10-18 | ||
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)
Thu 08/23 3:31 PM
SEALED Affidavit of Erin Johnson re12 Affidavit (DJP) |
|
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal Document
Thu 08/23 3:27 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 8/23/18. (DJP) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)
Thu 08/23 9:27 AM
MOTION to Seal Document by United States of America. (DJP) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Sealed document, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate
Wed 08/22 5:06 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by United States of America (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit
Wed 08/22 5:00 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Erin M. Johnson re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Redacted . (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Affidavit
Wed 08/22 2:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Judith K. Zeigler Wehrkamp re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) . (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate
Mon 08/06 2:08 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by United States of America (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice
Mon 07/30 4:33 PM
Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege signed by Shelia Lavonne Greenwald.(SST) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope postmarked 7/27/18 | ||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 07/13 4:50 PM
ORDER granting4 and6 Motions for Extension of Time to Answer and directing former defense counsel to respond to claims of ineffective assistance of counsel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 7/13/2018. (CG) |
|
Att: 1 waiver form | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 07/13 9:56 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion for Order Directing Former Defense Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance as to Judith Ziegler Wehrkamp filed by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 07/13 9:54 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion for Order Directing Former Defense Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 07/13 9:53 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion for Order Directing Former Defense Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance as to Erin Johnson filed by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 07/13 9:51 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion for Order Directing Former Defense Counsel to Respond to Claims of Ineffective Assistance by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 06/21 10:04 AM
ORDER for Service. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 6/20/2018. (JLS) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter Sent
Mon 06/18 4:00 PM
New Case LETTER with enclosed docket sheet sent by Clerk's Office to Shelia Lavonne Greenwald. (JLS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)
Mon 06/18 3:48 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28:2255 Criminal Case No.: 4:16-CR-40032-06 filed by Shelia Lavonne Greenwald. (JLS) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope postmarked 6-13-18 |