Powell et al v. Hall
Wyoming District Court | |
Judge: | Kelly H Rankin |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00096 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 15, 2018 3:10 AM MST |
Defendant
High Desert Trucking Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Landrum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Dean Mattar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warren Trussell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristofer Sullivan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kellen Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Powell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Parsons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Moody
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kalin McDonald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Graham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcus Eakins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Dill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Cardenas
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Shawn Hall
Terminated: 09/26/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Levi Hudson
Terminated: 09/06/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Himmel
Terminated: 09/06/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Graham
Terminated: 09/06/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Brown
Terminated: 09/06/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 01/24 1:12 PM
Amended NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Robert Powell (Shumaker, Seth) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (Court Staff, szf) |
|
Monday, January 21, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 01/21 8:11 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Robert Powell (Shumaker, Seth) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Party
Wed 09/26 3:27 PM
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting14 Motion to Dismiss Party. Defendant Shawn Hall is hereby dismissed as a party to this matter. (Court Staff, sjh) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Party
Wed 09/26 9:57 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss party Defendant Shawn Hall filed by Plaintiff Robert Powell. (Shumaker, Seth) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Pretrial Order
Tue 09/25 3:24 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Motions filing deadline 4/29/2019. Motion response deadline 5/13/2019. Motion Reply to Response due by 5/20/2019. Other Fact Witness Deadline 3/15/2019 Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 1/14/2019. Bifurcated Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 2/14/2019. Discovery due by 4/29/2019. Stipulation Deadline 6/4/2019. Motion in Limine deadline 6/4/2019. Motions in Limine Response Deadline 6/11/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2019 01:30 PM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 3 (Room No. 2104) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Bench Trial (3 Days/Stacked #1) set for 7/8/2019 09:00 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 3 (Room No. 2104) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, szf) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of IPT Conference
Tue 09/18 9:38 PM
NOTICE Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference reset from 9/19/2018 02:00 PM to 9/25/2018 09:00 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin.< All parties should appear by telephone, with Plaintiffs' counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307/433-2180. Parties are advised to have their calendars on hand to assist with scheduling./B> (Court Staff, szf) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of IPT Conference
Tue 09/11 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 9/19/2018 02:00 PM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H Rankin. (Court Staff, sal) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Continue (Non-Dispositive)
Tue 09/11 1:08 PM
NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - First MOTION to Continue (Non-Dispositive). Requesting continuance of scheduling conference filed by Plaintiff Marcus Eakins. (Shumaker, Seth) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 09/07 3:47 PM
First ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Shawn Hall, High Desert Trucking Inc. (Wilkins, Caleb) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 09/06 11:26 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Shawn Hall and High Desert Trucking Inc., filed by Kalin McDonald, Marcus Eakins, Mike Parsons, Robert Brown, Robert Powell, James Dean Mattar, David Moody, Jeffrey Graham, Mark Dill, Warren Trussell, Steven Cardenas, Charles Smith, Levi Hudson, Kristofer Sullivan, Scott Himmel, Robert Graham, Justin Landrum, Kellen Smith. (Court Staff, skb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Mon 08/27 3:38 PM
(TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. The Court held an informal conference with the parties on August 27, 2018, to discuss Plaintiff's4 Motion to Add Party. After hearing from the parties, the Court grants the Motion and orders Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint on or before September 5, 2018, as discussed in the informal conference. (Court Staff, sms) |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of IPT Conference
Wed 08/15 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2018 09:00 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. All parties should appear by telephone, with Plaintiffs' counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307/433-2180. Parties are advised to have their calendars on hand to assist with scheduling. (Court Staff, szf) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge
Mon 08/13 9:52 AM
STIPULATION of Consent to Trial before Magistrate Judge by all parties. (Court Staff, sjlg) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Add Party
Fri 08/03 2:03 PM
NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - First MOTION to Add Party Defendant & Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Robert Brown. (Shumaker, Seth) Modified text and document security on 8/3/2018 (Court Staff, szf) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/31 2:15 PM
First ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Affirmative Defenses, by Shawn Hall. (Wilkins, Caleb) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/23 3:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kalin McDonald, Marcus Eakins, Robert Brown, James Dean Mattar, David Moody, Jeffrey Graham, Mark Dill, Steven Cardenas, Levi Hudson, Scott Himmel, Robert Graham, Justin Landrum. Shawn Hall served on 7/17/2018, answer due on 8/7/2018. (Court Staff, skb) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/18 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT (summons(es) issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002085.), filed by Kalin McDonald, Marcus Eakins, Mike Parsons, Robert Brown, Robert Powell, James Dean Matter, David Moody, Jeffrey Graham, Mark Dill, Warren Trussell, Steven Cardenas, Charles Smith, Kristofer Sullivan, Levi Hudson, Scott Himmel, Robert Graham, Shawn Hall, Justin Landrum, Kellen Smith. (Court Staff, scat) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Consent to Magistrate Judge, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Letter |