Spicers Paper Inc v. Pioneer Printing and Stationary Company et al
Wyoming District Court | |
Judge: | Mark L Carman |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00094 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 15, 2018 2:15 AM MST |
Defendant
Pioneer Printing and Stationary Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jerome Ziemann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Spicers Paper Inc
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
A J Magee
Terminated: 07/17/2018
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Tue 04/09 3:43 PM
ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman granting22 Motion to Dismiss Case. (Court Staff, sea) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 04/08 1:34 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case, With Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Spicers Paper Inc.(Klinkner, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 03/04 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Settlement & Motion to Vacate All Deadlines by Plaintiff Spicers Paper Inc. Dismissal pleading due by 4/3/2019. (Klinkner, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Satisfaction of Judgment | ||
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 02/15 3:43 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Spicers Paper Inc.(Klinkner, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 01/28 4:51 PM
ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman granting14 Motion for Summary Judgment (Court Staff, sea) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order
Fri 12/21 11:02 AM
ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman denying16 Motion for ADR. (Court Staff, sea) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 12/14 1:21 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION for Order Alternative Dispute Resolution filed by Plaintiff Spicers Paper Inc. (Klinkner, Blake) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
motion
Order
Thu 12/13 5:01 PM
MOTION for Order Alternative Dispute Resolution filed by Defendants Pioneer Printing and Stationary Company, Jerome Ziemann. (Winship, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
11
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 12/12 9:04 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of14 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Spicers Paper Inc. (Klinkner, Blake) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 12/12 9:01 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Spicers Paper Inc.(Klinkner, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Pretrial Order
Wed 10/03 5:12 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER by the Honorable Mark L Carman. Motions filing deadline 5/13/2019. Motion response deadline 5/27/2019. Replies due by 6/3/2019. Other Fact Witness Deadline 3/29/2019 Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 1/28/2019. Expert Witness Designation-Defendant deadline 2/27/2019. Discovery due by 5/13/2019. Stipulation Deadline 6/20/2019. Bench Trial set for 7/23/2019 09:00 AM in Casper Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 106) before Honorable Mark L Carman. (Court Staff, sea) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 09/26 10:15 AM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Mark L Carman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/25/2018. (Court Staff, sea) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge
Wed 09/05 1:22 PM
STIPULATION of Consent to Trial before Magistrate Judge by Pioneer Printing and Stationary Company, Spicers Paper Inc, Jerome Ziemann. Initial Pretrial Conference remains set on 9/25/2018 at 3:00 p.m. Please see9 Notice of Hearing for Details. (Court Staff, sjlg) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Vacating Hearing
Mon 08/27 10:02 AM
PLEADING DOCKETED IN ERROR. (TEXT-ONLY) Order Vacating Hearing - by the Honorable Mark L. Carman. Due to the case's reassignment, the Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2018 is vacated. A new date for the Initial Pretrial Conference will be scheduled. (Court Staff, sea) Modified on 8/27/2018 (Court Staff, sea) |
|
utility
~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/27 1:20 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2018 03:00 PM in Yellowstone Justice Center before Honorable Mark L Carman. (Court Staff, sea) |
||
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of IPT Conference
Fri 08/24 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2018 03:00 PM in Yellowstone Justice Center (by telephone) before Honorable Mark L. Carman. (Court Staff, sea) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/22 1:33 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Jerome Ziemann, Pioneer Printing and Stationary Company. (Winship, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/17 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Spicers Paper Inc (Klinkner, Blake) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 06/29 11:39 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Spicers Paper Inc. Pioneer Printing and Stationary Company 6/22/2018, answer due 8/21/2018; Jerome Ziemann 6/22/2018, answer due 8/21/2018 (Klinkner, Blake) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Praecipe
Mon 06/18 2:44 PM
Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiff Spicers Paper Inc, 1 issued. (Court Staff, ssw) |
|
4 | 4
service
Praecipe
Mon 06/18 2:42 PM
Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiff Spicers Paper Inc, 1 issued. (Court Staff, ssw) |
|
3 | 3
service
Praecipe
Mon 06/18 2:40 PM
Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Spicers Paper Inc, 1 issued. (Court Staff, ssw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 06/18 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blake Anthony Klinkner on behalf of Spicers Paper Inc (Court Staff, ssw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/18 2:19 PM
COMPLAINT (3 summonses issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029007.), filed by Spicers Paper Inc. (Court Staff, ssw) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Consent |