Richie v. Heartland Financial USA, Inc et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas S Zilly |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00890 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 15, 2018 1:09 AM PST |
Defendant
Dubuque Bank and Trust Co
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Heartland Financial USA, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc Richie
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago |
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stipulated Motion
Wed 02/20 11:46 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice , filed by Defendants Dubuque Bank and Trust Co, Heartland Financial USA, Inc. Noting Date 2/20/2019, (Tabor, Kellie) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 02/20 12:31 PM
***Civil Case Terminated with prejudice per Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A) re:13 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims Asserted Against Defendants. (PM) |
||
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
TSZ Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM)
Wed 08/29 2:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Thomas S. Zilly; Length of Trial: *5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 9/16/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joinder of Parties due by 9/26/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 2/25/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/25/2019, Motions due by 4/18/2019, Discovery completed by 5/28/2019, Dispositive motions due by 6/27/2019, Motions in Limine due by 8/15/2019, Pretrial Order due by 8/30/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/30/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 8/30/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 1:30 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Joint Status Report
Fri 08/24 12:00 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. Filed by Defendants Dubuque Bank and Trust Co, Heartland Financial USA, Inc.(Tabor, Kellie) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Praecipe to Attach Document
Wed 06/27 1:23 PM
PRAECIPE to attach document signature page re8 Notice of Appearance by Defendants Dubuque Bank and Trust Co, Heartland Financial USA, Inc |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 06/26 3:50 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Marc Richie (Johnson, Daniel) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/26 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anne E Reuben on behalf of Defendants Dubuque Bank and Trust Co, Heartland Financial USA, Inc. |
|
notice
Notice re Lack of Proper Signature
Wed 06/27 10:09 AM
NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The8 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Anne E. Reuben . Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with[LINK:ECF Filing Procedures] . Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SWT) |
||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Mon 06/25 3:28 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/24/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/10/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/24/2018, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/25 2:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; by Dubuque Bank and Trust Co, Heartland Financial USA, Inc.(Tabor, Kellie) |
|
5 | 5
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/25 1:58 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dubuque Bank and Trust Co, Heartland Financial USA, Inc (Tabor, Kellie) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)
Tue 06/19 4:38 PM
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/19 4:35 PM
Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (DJ) |
||
utility
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
Tue 06/19 4:38 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Heartland Financial USA Inc, Dubuque Bank and Trust Co must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/26/2018. (DJ) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Mon 06/18 1:23 PM
DECLARATION of Shelley Zahn re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Dubuque Bank and Trust Co. d/b/a National Residential Mortgage, Heartland Financial USA, Inc.(Tabor, Kellie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
2 | 2
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Mon 06/18 1:22 PM
DECLARATION of Kellie A. Tabor re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Dubuque Bank and Trust Co. d/b/a National Residential Mortgage, Heartland Financial USA, Inc.(Tabor, Kellie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 06/18 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18 2-13374 2; , filed by Dubuque Bank and Trust Co. d/b/a National Residential Mortgage, Heartland Financial USA, Inc..(Tabor, Kellie) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1-6 |