Adams v. Berryhill
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | John C Coughenour |
Referred: | Theresa L Fricke |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00892 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment by Court
Thu 06/20 9:40 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT: The Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. The decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. (PM) |
|
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation
Thu 06/20 9:31 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION13 and affirming Defendant's decision to deny Plaintiff SSI benefits. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response to Objections to R&R
Tue 04/23 2:28 PM
RESPONSE to14 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Dion X Adams to13 Report and Recommendations. filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill (Mroczek, Danielle) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Objections to Report and Recommendation
Tue 04/23 8:25 AM
OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Dion X Adams to13 Report and Recommendations. Noting Date 5/10/2019, (Oliver, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Report and Recommendation
Wed 04/10 2:42 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO AFFIRM THE COMMISSIONER'S DECISION TO DENY DISABILITY BENEFITS; signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. Noting Date: 4/24/2019. (SP) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Brief - Reply
Thu 11/08 3:48 PM
REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Dion X Adams. (Oliver, David) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Brief - Responsive
Wed 10/17 11:06 AM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re10 Brief - Opening by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Mroczek, Danielle) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Brief - Opening
Thu 09/27 4:50 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Dion X Adams (Oliver, David) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
TLF-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order
Thu 08/30 10:11 AM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: The Answer and Administrative Record were filed in this case on 8/28/2018. Counsel shall now conform to the following briefing schedule: Opening Brief due by 9/27/2018, Responsive Brief due by 10/25/2018, Reply Brief due by 11/8/2018, Signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (mss) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Tue 08/28 11:14 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Mroczek, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 3 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 5 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 6 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 2 | ||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/10 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Danielle R Mroczek on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Mroczek, Danielle) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Fri 06/29 5:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on USAO-WDWA on 6/29/2018, filed by Plaintiff Dion X Adams. (Oliver, David) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/22 9:30 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Nancy A. Berryhill(TW) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/22 9:28 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Nancy A. Berryhill (Summons(es) as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) , filed by Dion X Adams.(TW) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/22 9:24 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke.(TW) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 06/19 12:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour and referred to Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke for all further proceedings. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M. McCool. (TW) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/19 10:42 AM
Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (CDA) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/18 1:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Dion X Adams.(Oliver, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |