Trivett v. Golden Alaska Seafoods, LLC
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | James L Robart |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00894 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 46:688 Jones Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 28, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 15, 2018 1:28 AM PST |
Defendant
Golden Alaska Seafoods, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
F/T Golden Alaska
|
|
Plaintiff
Cristina Lea Trivett
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Case
Mon 01/28 2:10 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing this matter with prejudice and without costs to any party re parties'14 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Stipulated Motion
Mon 01/28 10:21 AM
Stipulated MOTION DISMISSING THE CASE WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS , filed by Plaintiff Cristina Lea Trivett. Noting Date 2/8/2019, (Lindquist, Neil) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
JLR Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM)
Thu 08/30 1:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 12/16/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 9/27/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 6/19/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/19/2019, Motions due by 7/19/2019, Discovery completed by 8/19/2019, Dispositive motions due by 9/17/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 10/17/2019, Motions in Limine due by 11/4/2019, Pretrial Order due by 11/25/2019, Deposition Designations due by 11/27/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 12/9/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 12/9/2019. (AD) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Joint Status Report
Tue 08/28 12:03 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. (Lindquist, Neil) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 08/28 11:37 AM
SHOW CAUSE MINUTE ORDER - Counsel are directed to show cause by 9/7/2018 why this action should not be dismissed for failing to file a Joint Status Report. (AD) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Mon 07/16 4:23 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/30/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/13/2018. (AD) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Association
Fri 07/13 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Gordon C Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Cristina Lea Trivett. (Webb, Gordon) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/09 10:15 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Golden Alaska Seafoods, LLC (Spivak, Svetlana) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Association
Fri 07/06 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Association of Attorney by John W Merriam on behalf of Plaintiff Cristina Lea Trivett. (Merriam, John) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/03 10:08 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Golden Alaska Seafoods, LLC.(Spivak, Svetlana) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/03 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Svetlana P Spivak on behalf of Defendant Golden Alaska Seafoods, LLC. (Spivak, Svetlana) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Acceptance of Service by Counsel
Fri 06/29 11:16 AM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Svetlana P. Spivak, on behalf of Golden Alaska Seafoods, LLC, on 6/29/2018. (Lindquist, Neil) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/26 9:52 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Golden Alaska Seafoods, LLC. (PM) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Mon 06/25 1:13 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Defendant Golden Alaska Seafoods, LLC by Plaintiff Cristina Lea Trivett(Lindquist, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/19 1:51 PM
Judge James L. Robart added. (CDA) |
||
utility
Notice to Filer
Tue 06/19 1:59 PM
NOTICE TO FILER: Prepayment of the filing fee is waived under 28 U.S.C. § 1916; if due, the filing fee must be paid at the conclusion of the case. (CDA) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/18 4:12 PM
COMPLAINT Seamans Complaint In Rem And In Personam For Damages For Personal Injuries against defendant(s) Golden Alaska Seafoods, LLC with JURY DEMAND Attorney Neil Thomas Lindquist added to party Cristina Lea Trivett(pty:pla), filed by Cristina Lea Trivett.(Lindquist, Neil) (Fee Waived) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |