THOMAS v. FERGUSON et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J Curtis Joyner |
Referred: | Marilyn Heffley |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-02561 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2018 |
Petitioner
JEFFREY THOMAS
|
|
Respondent
TANNY FERGUSON
|
|
Respondent
THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
|
|
Respondent
THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF DELAWARE
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 05/23 12:51 PM
ORDER of USCA as to14 Notice of Appeal, filed by JEFFREY THOMAS THAT THE REQUEST FOR A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY IS DENIED. (jpd, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
appeal
USCA Appeal Fees
Wed 01/23 1:20 PM
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number PPE191266 re14 Notice of Appeal, filed by JEFFREY THOMAS (pr, ) |
||
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Tue 01/15 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re14 Notice of Appeal, filed by JEFFREY THOMAS. USCA Case Number 19-1117 (dmc, ) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 01/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to13 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, by THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF DELAWARE. Filing fee $ 505. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and Appeal Record due by 1/17/2018. (MCDONALD, SHANNON) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 12/18 11:30 AM
ORDER THAT THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED; THE PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND REQUEST TO STAY AND HOLD IN ABEYANCE ARE DENIED; THERE IS NO BASIS FOR THE ISSUANCE OF A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 12/17/18. 12/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL. (pr, ) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice re: Report and Recommendation
Thu 12/06 9:06 AM
***(Court Only) Civ624 Notice to the Court regarding Report and Recommendation.(pr, ) |
|
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Objections
Wed 12/05 2:07 PM
Objections by JEFFREY THOMAS to Report and Recommendations . (MCDONALD, SHANNON) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 11/26 2:59 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER TO HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/26/18. 11/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 11/21 11:34 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND REQUEST TO STAY AND HOLD IN ABEYANCE BE DENIED AND DISMISSED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 11/21/2018. 11/21/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Notice | ||
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
trial
Exhibit
Thu 11/08 3:32 PM
Transcript of Proceedings dated 2/12/14-Volumes I and II.(pr, ) |
|
Att: 1 Vol. II | ||
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stay
Fri 11/02 11:08 AM
REQUEST to Stay and Hold in Abeyance filed by JEFFREY THOMAS, Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MCDONALD, SHANNON) Modified on 11/2/2018 (md) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum | ||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Transcript - PDF
Thu 08/30 4:03 PM
Exhibit re: Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/15/16, before Judge THE HONORABLE JAMES NILON, CCP-Delaware. (pr, ) Modified on 8/30/2018 (pr, ) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
respoth
Response
Fri 07/20 9:42 AM
Response in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by TANNY FERGUSON, THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF DELAWARE. (NEDURIAN, VRAM) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum | ||
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order for Prisoner State Record
Wed 06/27 1:21 PM
ORDER THAT THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF DELAWARE COUNTY SHALL FILE SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWER, WITH EXHIBITS ATTACHED, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THE PROTHONOTARY, CLERK OF COURT, OR OFFICE OF JUDICIAL SUPPORT OF DELAWRE COUNTY SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, TRIAL, SENTENCING, SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, POST CONVICTION HEARINGS, PETITIONS, PLEADINGS, OPINIONS AND BRIEFS OF STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH v. THOMAS, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF DELAWARE COUNTY,CP-23-CR-4364-2013 WITHIN 60 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. PRISONER STATE RECORD DUE BY 8/27/2018.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 6/26/18. 6/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO RESPONDENTS, D.A.-DELAWARE COUNTY, E-MAILED TO COUNSEL AND CCP-DELAWARE COUNTY.(pr, ) |
|
misc
Remark
Wed 06/27 1:24 PM
Mailed petition, docket and order dated 6/26/18 to D.A.-Delaware County, respondent, PA Attorney General (Harrisburg & Phila.) (pr, ) |
||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/25 4:33 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OF DELAWARE COUNTY, PA WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/25/18. 6/25/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO D.A.-DELAWARE COUNTY, PA, E-MAILED TO COUNSEL. (pr, ) |
|
misc
Remark
Mon 06/25 4:34 PM
Mailed petition, docket, and order dated 6/25/18 to D.A.-Delaware County, PA. (pr, ) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
Tue 06/19 4:10 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 06/19 4:08 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 180132.), filed by JEFFREY THOMAS.(jwl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet |