Gallagher v. NSA et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond P Moore |
Referred: | Kathleen M Tafoya |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-01525 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 15, 2018 2:37 AM MST |
Judge Raymond P. Moore
United States District Court District of Colorado Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse 901 19th Street
Denver,, CO 80294 |
|
Defendant
NSA
|
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Gallagher
1723 Candleglow
Castle Rock, CO 80108 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Rodgers
Terminated: 08/06/2018
|
|
Defendant
David J. Sherman
Terminated: 08/23/2018
|
|
Defendant
Department of Defense
Terminated: 08/23/2018
|
Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago |
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
100 | 100
order
Judgment
Mon 09/14 4:45 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to Orders92 and99 . Entered by the Clerk of the Court on 9/14/2020. (cpear) |
|
99 | 99
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations
Mon 09/14 4:10 PM
ORDER granting95 Motion for Summary Judgment, adopting98 Report and Recommendation, dismissing Plaintiff's Claim One. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/14/2020. (cpear) |