|
GPO
Sep 06 2018
ORDER granting 41 STIPULATION Extending Case Deadlines. Response due by 9/28/2018. Reply due by 10/12/2018. Motion Hearing and Further Case Management Conference reset for 11/7/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2018. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/06/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
|
|
GPO
Dec 12 2018
Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Dismiss. SAP's motion to dismiss is GRANTED with regards to the trade secret misappropriation claims but DENIED with regards to all other claims. Teradata's first amended complaint is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND within ten days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
|
|
GPO
Jun 14 2019
ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting 102 Motion. The Disputes are returned to Judge Laporte for resolution. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
|
|
GPO
Nov 04 2019
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S 185 MOTION FOR RELIEF by Judge William H. Orrick also denying 146 Motion for Protective Order and granting 184,186 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
|
|
GPO
Apr 07 2020
Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero regarding 239 Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
|
|
GPO
Apr 28 2020
ORDER granting as modified 239 Motion to Issue Letters of Request. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 28, 2020. (Attachments: # (1) Letter re Infolytics (English), # (2) Letter re Infolytics (German), # (3) Letter re Individuals (English), # (4) Letter re Individuals (German)) (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
|
|
GPO
Jul 15 2020
CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/15/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
|
|
GPO
Oct 01 2020
Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 296 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, and ordering Plaintiffs to show cause why the administrative motion should not be denied with respect to Exhibit 8. Public versions and show cause response due October 8, 2020. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
|
|
GPO
Oct 09 2020
Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero regarding 295 Discovery Letter Brief. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
|
|
GPO
Oct 10 2020
Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero suspending Teradata's obligation to respond to interrogatories as stated in 313 Order, in response to 314 Emergency Motion. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2020)
|
|
GPO
Oct 10 2020
Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero regarding 291 Discovery Letter Brief. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2020)
|
|
GPO
Oct 10 2020
Supplemental order regarding 295 discovery letter and 314 emergency motion. This modifies previous orders at docket entries 313 and 315. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 10, 2020. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2020)
|
|
GPO
Nov 12 2020
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ENFORCE by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
|
|
GPO
Dec 04 2020
ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero regarding 338 Discovery Letter Brief. (jcslc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
|
|
GPO
Dec 17 2020
ORDER denying 338 request to compel companywide email search. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on December 17, 2020. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
|
|
GPO
Dec 17 2020
Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero resolving 367 Discovery Letter Brief. Lead trial counsel and the CEO of each party shall appear at 9:30 AM on December 18, 2020. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
|
|
GPO
Jan 26 2021
ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 339 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Teradata shall file all of the documents at issue in the public record no later than February 1, 2021. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
|
|
GPO
Apr 01 2021
CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 4/1/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
|
|
GPO
Apr 02 2021
AMENDED CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 4/2/2021. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
|
|
GPO
Nov 08 2021
ORDER RE 467,472 MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND 466,470,474,476,480,495 MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY (redacted of confidential information) by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
|