Bishop v. Valley Medical Center
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | James L Robart |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00885 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 12:51 AM PST |
Defendant
Valley Medical Center
|
|
Plaintiff
Debra Bishop
1307 WHEATON WAY #108
BREMERTON, WA 98310 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, July 05, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
Mandate of USCA
Mon 07/08 1:51 PM
MANDATE OF USCA 18-36085 as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by Debra Bishop. The Judgment from USCA takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. DISMISSED. (GT) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
appeal
Order of USCA
Thu 06/13 5:31 PM
ORDER of USCA (NOT THE MANDATE 18-36085 as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by Debra Bishop. DISMISSED (CDA) |
|
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 02/05 4:28 PM
ORDER signed by Judge James L. Robart re:18 Referral Notice from 9th Circuit. The court hereby certifies this appeal is frivolous. An appeal is frivolous if it lacks an arguable basis in either law or fact. See Martin v. Sias, 88 F.3d 774, 775 (9th Cir. 1996). This court concludes Ms. Bishop's appeal lacks an arguable basis in law and is therefore frivolous. Accordingly, IFP status should be revoked on appeal. (GT) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 01/28 1:25 PM
REFERRAL NOTICE from 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 18-36085 re16 Notice of Appeal. This matter is referred to the district court for the limited purpose of determining whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal or whether the appeal is frivolous or taken in bad faith. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3); see also Hooker v. American Airlines, 302 F.3d 1091, 1092 (9th Cir. 2002) . If the district court elects to revoke in forma pauperis status, the district court is requested to notify this court and the parties of such determination within 21 days of the date of this referral. If the district court does not revoke in forma pauperis status, such status will continue automatically for this appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). This referral shall not affect the briefing schedule previously established by this court. (CDA) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Time Schedule Order
Fri 12/28 3:13 PM
TIME SCHEDULE ORDER 18-36085 as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by Debra Bishop : (SG) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Notice of Appeal to Circuit
Thu 12/27 9:23 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re15 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, by Plaintiff Debra Bishop. (SG) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Wed 12/12 9:17 AM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's14 Motion for Reconsideration; advising Plaintiff that no further motions for reconsideration of Court's Order Dismissing Complaint will be considered. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Reopen Case
Fri 11/23 11:50 AM
MOTION to Reinstate Case, filed by Plaintiff Debra Bishop. Noted by Clerk for 12/7/2018, (TH) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 11/06 3:39 PM
Mail addressed to Debra Bishop returned as Undeliverable re12 Order on Motion for Reconsideration (SWT) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Wed 10/10 1:57 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's11 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: plaintiff via certified mail Modified on 10/10/2018 to add receipt number (PM) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Reconsideration
Wed 09/26 8:07 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by Plaintiff Debra Bishop. Noted by Clerk for 9/24/2018. (PM) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment by Court
Wed 08/22 9:44 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT: Plaintiff Debra Bishop's amended complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Order (Dkt. #9 ).) (PM) |
|
9 | 9
order
1 - Order
Wed 08/22 9:42 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION for failure to timely amend the complaint or remedy the deficiencies identified in the court's order6 . Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other
Wed 07/25 3:39 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint due within 14 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(PM) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time-Other
Tue 07/24 4:42 PM
REQUEST/MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint , filed by Plaintiff Debra Bishop. Noted by Clerk for 8/3/2018, (TH) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Mon 07/02 3:31 PM
ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) with leave to amend within 21 days of the filing of this order. The court further DENIES Ms. Bishop's motion to appoint counsel (Dkt. #5 ). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 06/19 3:38 PM
MOTION for Court-Appointed Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Debra Bishop. Noted by Clerk for 7/6/2018. (PM) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/19 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Valley Medical Center , filed by Debra Bishop. (PM) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/19 3:34 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (PM) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Letter
Tue 06/19 2:35 PM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (CDA) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/19 2:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Brian A Tsuchida, filed by Debra Bishop.(CDA) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Application for Court-Appointed Counsel, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |