Price v. Berryhill
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | J Richard Creatura |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00896 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 06/24 3:18 PM
ORDER granting25 Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Fri 06/21 9:15 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Anthony Michael Price(Osterhout, Karl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit IFP, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 06/05 5:19 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re25 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act, by Judge J Richard Creatura. Show Cause Response due by 6/21/2019. (KAM) |
|
motion
Motion Calendar
Wed 06/05 5:23 PM
Response to Order to Show Cause Due re25 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 6/21/2019. (KAM) |
||
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Attorney Fees
Wed 05/29 5:53 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act , filed by Plaintiff Anthony Michael Price. Noting Date 6/14/2017, (Osterhout, Karl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EAJA Rates, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Itemizatio, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Fee Assignment/Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Net Worth, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
Judgment
Fri 03/01 12:25 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Anthony Michael Price and against Commissioner of Social Security, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) |
|
23 | 23
order
1 - Order
Fri 03/01 12:12 PM
ORDER re3 Plaintiff's Complaint, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Brief - Responsive
Thu 12/13 3:02 PM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re16 Brief - Opening by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Martin, Sarah) |
|
Friday, November 23, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 11/23 12:40 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion Amending Scheduling Order signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. Responsive Brief now due by 12/13/2018; Reply Brief due by 12/27/2018. (KAM) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Declaration
Wed 11/21 2:17 PM
DECLARATION of Jacob P. Phillips filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security re19 Unopposed MOTION to Amend15 Order, Set Deadlines, (Martin, Sarah) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Amend
Wed 11/21 2:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend15 Order, Set Deadlines, , filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Noting Date 11/21/2018, (Martin, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Fri 11/02 7:04 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Lisa Goldoftas for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Goldoftas, Lisa) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 11/02 7:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah L Martin on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Martin, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Brief - Opening
Tue 10/23 9:58 AM
OPENING BRIEF Amended Brief re15 Order, Set Deadlines by Plaintiff Anthony Michael Price (Osterhout, Karl) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
1 - Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 10/17 11:43 AM
ORDER re11 AMENDING Briefing Schedule Order: Opening Brief due by 10/26/2018, Responsive Brief due by 11/23/2018, Reply Brief due by 12/7/2018, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) |
|
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs
Wed 10/17 11:34 AM
ORDER denying12 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Brief - Opening
Mon 10/15 1:28 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Anthony Michael Price (Osterhout, Karl) |
|
12 | 12
motion
File Over-length Motions and Briefs
Mon 10/15 8:30 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs , filed by Plaintiff Anthony Michael Price.(Osterhout, Karl) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
JRC-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order
Mon 09/17 12:57 PM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: The Answer and Administrative Record were filed in this case on 9/14/2018. Counsel shall now conform to the following briefing schedule: Opening Brief due by 10/15/2018, Responsive Brief due by 11/13/2018, Reply Brief due by 11/26/2018, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (SH) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Fri 09/14 8:18 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill.(Goldoftas, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 3 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 5 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 6 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 2 | ||
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/26 9:17 AM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Nancy A Berryhill on 7/16/2018 (Osterhout, Karl) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/25 8:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lisa Goldoftas on behalf of Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Goldoftas, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/27 9:40 AM
ORDER re6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Karl E Osterhout for Plaintiff Anthony Michael Price, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/27 6:40 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Karl Osterhout FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Anthony Michael Price (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5373634 (Gibson, Donna) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge
Thu 06/21 1:33 PM
CONSENT filed by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KAM) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/21 9:56 AM
Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant Nancy A Berryhill (Summons to Attorney General, D.C. attached as main document).(SH) |
|
Att: 1 Summons to Regional Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Summons to US Attorney Seattle | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/21 9:53 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant Nancy A Berryhill (Summonses as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) , filed by Anthony Michael Price.(SH) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/21 9:44 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SH) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 06/20 4:21 PM
Judge J. Richard Creatura added. (DJ) |
||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/19 9:36 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Anthony Michael Price.(Gibson, Donna) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |