Gray v. Snohomish County Corrections et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Referred: | Brian A Tsuchida |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00900 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 09/05 12:06 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez re7 Report and Recommendations. (cc: plaintiff via USPS)(ST) |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 08/15 8:58 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint;6 Letter re Deficiency. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) Objections to R&R due by 8/29/2018, Noting Date 8/31/2018,(ST) |
|
Att: 1 PROPOSED Order of Dismissal, | ||
Att: 2 PROPOSED Judgment | ||
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
utility
IFP Deficiency Letter
Thu 07/12 10:30 AM
LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The5 Prison Trust Account Statement is dated 5/9/18 and does not include the last six months of account activity as required. Please obtain a recent statement and submit to the court by the deadline indicated in this letter. Filer has until 8/13/2018 to correct. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (ST) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Prison Trust Account Statement
Thu 07/12 10:25 AM
Prison Trust Account Statement re3 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis;4 Letter. Letter6 re outstanding deficiency sent to plaintiff. (ST) |
|
misc
IFP Deficiency Corrected
Thu 07/12 10:21 AM
IFP deficiency corrected in part re4 IFP Deficiency Letter. Prison Trust Account submitted but statement is dated 5/9/18 and does not include the last six months of account activity as required. (ST) |
||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
utility
IFP Deficiency Letter
Fri 06/29 12:59 PM
LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 7/30/2018 to correct. (ST) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Application
Fri 06/29 12:58 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff James Earl Gray, Jr (ST) |
|
Att: 1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint | ||
misc
IFP Deficiency Corrected
Fri 06/29 12:56 PM
IFP deficiency corrected in part re2 IFP Deficiency Letter. (ST) |
||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
utility
IFP Deficiency Letter
Tue 06/19 2:00 PM
LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $400.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status. - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 7/19/2018 to correct (SG) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Proposed Document(s)
Tue 06/19 1:58 PM
PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Plaintiff James Earl Gray, Jr (NO FILING FEE, NO IFP) (SG) |