White et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | James L Robart |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00901 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 16, 2018 1:59 AM PST |
Defendant
National Railroad Passenger Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Seattle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lester White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle White
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/24 3:21 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (AD) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 08/20 11:20 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: At the direction of the court, the 8/31/2020 Pretrial Conference is now converted to a Telephonic Status Conference at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. (AD) |
||
Wednesday, April 15, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name
Wed 04/15 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Allen M Ressler. Filed by Plaintiffs Lester White, Michelle White. |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Wed 01/15 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Jeffrey Michael Dore for Defendant Aramark Uniform Services. (Dore, Jeffrey) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/15 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Natasha A Khachatourians on behalf of Defendant Aramark Uniform Services. (Khachatourians, Natasha) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Thu 05/30 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Laura E Kruse for Defendant Aramark Uniform Services. (Dore, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
order
JLR Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM)
Thu 05/23 9:22 AM
AMENDED MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *3-4 days*. Jury Trial is set for 9/14/2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 9/21/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 3/18/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/18/2020, Motions due by 4/17/2020, Discovery completed by 5/18/2020, Dispositive motions due by 6/16/2020, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 7/16/2020, Motions in Limine due by 8/3/2020, Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2020, Deposition Designations due by 8/26/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/8/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/8/2020. (AD) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation
Mon 05/20 4:19 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Scheduling Trial Date by parties (Dore, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
1 - Order
Tue 05/14 8:48 AM
ORDER denying parties'25 Stipulated Motion to Extend Trial and Related Dates. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation
Fri 05/10 3:50 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO AMEND TRIAL DATE by parties (Dore, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/02 5:34 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Aramark Intermediate HoldCo Corporation, Other Affiliate Aramark Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Aramark Uniform Services (Matchpoint) LLC, Other Affiliate Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group, Inc. for Aramark Uniform Services. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aramark Uniform Services (Dore, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Amended Document
Fri 04/26 2:41 PM
AMENDMENT Joint Status Report to10 Joint Status Report by Plaintiffs Lester White, Michelle White |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 03/14 4:04 PM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Aramark Uniform Services.(Kruse, Laura) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Fri 03/01 2:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Aramark Uniform Services on 2/22/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Lester White, Michelle White. |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/27 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Laura E Kruse on behalf of Defendant Aramark Uniform Services. (Kruse, Laura) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Thu 02/28 10:06 AM
Attorney Jeffrey Michael Dore for Aramark Uniform Services added; per20 Notice of Appearance. (SWT) |
||
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/21 9:31 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Aramark Uniform Services (SWT) |
|
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Wed 02/20 11:07 AM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Aramark Uniform Services by Plaintiffs Lester White, Michelle White |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 02/14 11:59 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s). All Plaintiffs Attorney Allen M Ressler added to party Lester White(pty:pla), Attorney Allen M Ressler added to party Michelle White(pty:pla), filed by Lester White, Michelle White |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 02/13 2:01 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiffs'14 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and to Add Parties. Plaintiffs may file their First Amended Complaint within 5 days of this Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(LW) |
|
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Declaration
Fri 02/01 2:52 PM
DECLARATION of Allen M. Ressler In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File An Amended Complaint and To Add Parties filed by Plaintiffs Lester White, Michelle White re14 MOTION for Leave to File to File An Amended Complaint And to Add Parties |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
14 | 14
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 02/01 2:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to File to File An Amended Complaint And to Add Parties , filed by Plaintiffs Lester White, Michelle White. Noting Date 3/1/2019, |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Tue 09/25 12:09 PM
ORDER granting defendants'12 Stipulated Motion for Leave for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)(Attorneys Tim Wackerbath, Andrew Gordon Yates for City of Seattle added; Attorney Tara N Gillespie terminated) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Leave
Mon 09/24 10:37 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Leave to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel for Defendant City of Seattle , filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Noting Date 9/24/2018, (Yates, Andrew) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
JLR Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM)
Fri 08/24 3:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *3-4 days*. Jury Trial is set for 11/25/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 9/21/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 5/29/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/29/2019, Motions due by 6/28/2019, Discovery completed by 7/29/2019, Dispositive motions due by 8/27/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 9/26/2019, Motions in Limine due by 10/15/2019, Pretrial Order due by 11/4/2019, Deposition Designations due by 11/6/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/18/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 11/18/2019. (AD) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Joint Status Report
Tue 08/21 12:43 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4. |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Tue 07/17 2:33 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/31/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/14/2018. (AD) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Verification of State Court Records
Tue 07/03 12:02 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Yates, Andrew) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/02 11:19 AM
ANSWER to Complaint; by City of Seattle.(Gillespie, Tara) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/25 3:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Yates, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)
Thu 06/21 9:51 AM
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ST) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 06/21 9:49 AM
Judge James L. Robart added. (ST) |
||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/19 3:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate United States of America for National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Odom, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Tue 06/19 3:09 PM
DECLARATION of Jeffrey M. Odom re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation(Odom, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice-Other
Tue 06/19 3:08 PM
NOTICE to Adverse Parties re1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Odom, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 06/19 3:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18 2-13375 1; , filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Odom, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint |