Leung v. United States et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Bryan |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05491 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 15, 2018 1:45 AM PST |
Defendant
North Cascade Trustee Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
State of Washington
|
|
Defendant
United States
|
|
Defendant
United States Department of Agriculture
|
|
Defendant
United States Federal Emergency Management Administration
|
|
Defendant
United States Social Security Administration
|
|
Defendant
United States Trustee
|
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Leung
A Natural Free-Born American Private Citizen, Aggrieved/Injured Party PO BOX 821922
VANCOUVER, WA 98682 |
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Mandate of USCA
Fri 02/01 9:17 AM
MANDATE of USCA 18-35702 as to7 Notice of Appeal filed by Jennifer Leung. A review of the docket demonstrates that appellant has failed to respond to the December 13, 2018 order of this court. Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. (CDA) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
appeal
Order of USCA
Mon 08/27 10:53 AM
ORDER of USCA 18-35702 as to the7 Notice of Appeal filed by Jennifer Leung. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. **See Order for remaining details**(CMG) |
|
Att: 1 Court of Appeals Form 4 | ||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
Appeal Number from USCA Time Schedule Order
Fri 08/24 10:36 AM
TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/USCA CASE NUMBER 18-35702 as to the7 Notice of Appeal filed by Jennifer Leung. (GMR) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Notice of Appeal to Circuit
Tue 08/21 10:55 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re5 Order Dismissing Case by Plaintiff Jennifer Leung. Filing Fee $0.(GMR) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment by Court
Mon 08/06 12:15 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of North Cascade Trustee Services Inc, State of Washington, United States, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Federal Emergency Management Administration, United States Social Security Administration, United States Trustee against Jennifer Leung. Paper copy sent to Plaintiff at Vancouver address. (TC) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/31 8:58 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Vancouver address. (JL) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
1 - Order
Mon 06/25 12:57 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff IS GRANTED LEAVE to file a Proposed Amended Complaint by 7/19/18; failure to file will result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Paper copy sent to plaintiff at Vancouver WA address. (JL) |
|
motion
Motion Calendar
Mon 06/25 1:00 PM
Proposed Amended Complaint due or dismiss case re4 Order on 7/19/2018. (JL) |
||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
utility
IFP Deficiency Letter
Tue 06/19 12:53 PM
LETTER mailed to filer re Case Opening Deficiency: - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $400.00 filing fee or an Application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status (enclosed). - A completed Civil Cover Sheet must be filed. Please complete the enclosed form and file it with the Court. - NOTE: a money order for the incorrect amount ($5.00) was submitted with new case. The court is unable to process partial payments, and as such, it is being returned with this letter. Filer has until 7/19/2018 to correct. (GMR) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Proposed Document(s)
Tue 06/19 12:45 PM
PROPOSED Common Law Petition for Redress of Grievance filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Leung. ($5.00 money order returned; filing fee in full ($400.00) or Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis required)(GMR) (GMR) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
Att: 2 (6/19/2018) Transmittal Letter |