Reynolds v. Berryhill
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | David W Christel |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05493 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 30, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 08/30 8:15 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion for Authorization of Attorney Fees Pursuant 42 U.S.C. §406(b), signed by Judge David W. Christel. (GMR) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Declaration
Fri 07/08 10:53 AM
DECLARATION of Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Michael Reynolds re27 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 406(b) (Tree, D) |
|
33 | 33
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 07/08 10:31 AM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Michael Reynolds, TO RESPONSE to27 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 406(b) (Tree, D) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 06/30 2:18 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security, to27 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 406(b) . (Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2022 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Tue 06/21 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Diana Andsager for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Andsager, Diana) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Tue 06/21 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney David Burdett for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Burdett, David) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/21 9:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Edmund John Darcher on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Darcher, Edmund) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public)
Tue 06/21 4:31 PM
Noting Date Set/Reset re27 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 406(b): Motion reset for 7/8/2022. (ZMG) |
||
Monday, June 20, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Declaration
Mon 06/20 2:10 PM
DECLARATION of D. James Tree filed by Plaintiff Michael Reynolds re27 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 406(b) (Tree, D) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 06/20 2:09 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 406(b) , filed by Plaintiff Michael Reynolds. Noting Date 7/20/2022, (Tree, D) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Award, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Written Fee Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Itemized Billing Statement, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/19 10:58 AM
ORDER ON MOTION FOR EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT FEES AND EXPENSES by Judge David W. Christel re21 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA, filed by Plaintiff Michael Reynolds.(KEB) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 03/18 2:34 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security, to21 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA . (Andsager, Diana) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Declaration
Mon 03/04 4:54 PM
DECLARATION of Michael Reynolds filed by Plaintiff Michael Reynolds re21 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA (Tree, D) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Declaration
Mon 03/04 4:53 PM
DECLARATION of Marcus Fry filed by Plaintiff Michael Reynolds re21 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA (Tree, D) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Declaration
Mon 03/04 4:53 PM
DECLARATION of D. James Tree filed by Plaintiff Michael Reynolds re21 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA (Tree, D) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 03/04 4:52 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA , filed by Plaintiff Michael Reynolds. Noting Date 3/22/2019, (Tree, D) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Itemized Billing Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Written Fee Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Law Clerk Resume, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment by Court
Wed 12/19 10:14 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of Michael Reynolds. This matter is reversed and remanded for further administrative proceedings. (KEB) |
|
19 | 19
7
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/19 10:12 AM
ORDER REVERSING AND REMANDING DEFENDANT'S DECISION TO DENY BENEFITS by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Brief - Reply
Tue 12/04 11:58 AM
REPLY BRIEF re17 Brief - Responsive by Plaintiff Michael Reynolds. (Tree, D) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Brief - Responsive
Wed 11/21 3:21 PM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re11 Brief - Opening by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Andsager, Diana) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Social Security Order re Extension of Brief Deadlines
Fri 10/19 9:47 AM
ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: re14 MOTION to Amend10 DWC-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order, unopposed by Judge David W. Christel. Responsive Brief due by 11/21/2018, Reply Brief due by 12/5/2018. (KEB) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Declaration
Thu 10/18 4:54 PM
DECLARATION of Diana Andsager filed by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill re14 MOTION to Amend10 DWC-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order,, unopposed (Andsager, Diana) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Amend
Thu 10/18 4:52 PM
MOTION to Amend10 DWC-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order,, unopposed , filed by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. Noting Date 10/19/2018, (Andsager, Diana) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Thu 10/04 10:29 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Jeffrey E Staples for Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Staples, Jeffrey) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/04 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Diana Andsager on behalf of Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Andsager, Diana) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Brief - Opening
Mon 09/24 8:18 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Michael Reynolds (Tree, D) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
DWC-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order
Mon 08/27 8:48 AM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: The Answer and Administrative Record were filed in this case on 8/27/2018. Counsel shall now conform to the following briefing schedule: Opening Brief due by 9/24/2018, Responsive Brief due by 10/22/2018, Reply Brief due by 11/5/2018, by Judge David W. Christel. (LL) |
|
9 | 9
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Mon 08/27 7:29 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Burdett, David) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/02 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David J Burdett on behalf of Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Burdett, David) |
|
Saturday, July 14, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sat 07/14 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey E Staples on behalf of Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Staples, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/21 9:20 AM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Nancy A Berryhill on 6/21/2018 (Tree, D) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/20 4:59 PM
CONSENT by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KEB) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/20 4:17 PM
Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant Nancy A Berryhill (Summons to Attorney General, D.C. attached as main document)(SH) |
|
Att: 1 Summons to Office of the General Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Summons to US Attorney Seattle | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/20 4:12 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Nancy A Berryhill (Summonses as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) , filed by Michael Reynolds.(SH) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/20 4:11 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge David W. Christel.(SH) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 06/20 8:09 AM
Judge David W. Christel added. (GMR) |
||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/19 8:19 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Michael Reynolds.(Tree, D) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons |