Pagecom, Inc. v. Sprint Solutions, Inc. et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Benjamin H Settle |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05495 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 16, 2018 1:47 AM PST |
Defendant
Annette Jacobs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sprint Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pagecom, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Receipt
Mon 09/17 10:55 AM
CONFORMED COPY RECEIVED re17 Remand Letter to Pierce County Superior Court. (GMR) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Remand Letter
Fri 09/07 1:51 PM
LETTER to Pierce County Superior Court Remanding Case per16 Order. (GMR) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
utility
Terminate Motions (Public, notice to parties)
Mon 08/27 11:34 AM
***Motion14 to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., Annette Jacobs is terminated as moot per16 Order remanding case. (MGC) |
||
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Thu 08/23 9:57 AM
ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting9 Motion to Remand and denying request for attorney fees.(TG) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 09/07 1:49 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per16 Order. (GMR) |
||
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 08/15 10:06 AM
Reset Deadlines pursuant to the request and agreement of the parties: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/5/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/12/2018, Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018. (MGC) |
||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Mon 08/13 10:32 AM
Attorney Peggy C. Hughes added for Annette Jacobs per13 Notice of Appearance. (MGC) |
||
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 08/09 4:29 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Pagecom, Inc., TO RESPONSE to9 MOTION to Remand (Morrill, Howard) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss
Thu 08/09 1:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration , filed by Defendants Annette Jacobs, Sprint Solutions, Inc.. Noting Date 8/31/2018, (Hamell, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/08 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph A Hamell on behalf of Defendant Annette Jacobs. (Hamell, Joseph) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Declaration
Mon 08/06 4:08 PM
DECLARATION of Annette Jacobs filed by Defendant Sprint Solutions, Inc. re9 MOTION to Remand (Hamell, Joseph) |
|
11 | 11
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 08/06 4:05 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant Sprint Solutions, Inc., to9 MOTION to Remand .(Hamell, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand | ||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Declaration
Fri 07/13 3:45 PM
DECLARATION of Howard R. Morrill filed by Plaintiff Pagecom, Inc. re9 MOTION to Remand(Morrill, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
9 | 9
motion
Remand
Fri 07/13 3:41 PM
MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Pagecom, Inc.. Noting Date 8/10/2018, (Morrill, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Thu 06/21 2:14 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/5/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/12/2018, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG) |
|
7 | 7
order
Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM)
Thu 06/21 2:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)
Wed 06/20 11:11 AM
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (NOTE: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 101(c), if a motion is pending and undecided in the state court at the time of removal, it will not be considered unless and until the moving party notes the motion on this court's calendar in accordance with Local Civil Rule 7(d). (GMR) |
|
5 | 5
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/20 10:13 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parents Sprint Communications, Inc and Sprint Corporation for Sprint Solutions, Inc. indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates . Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc. (Hamell, Joseph) Modified on 6/20/2018 (GMR) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 06/20 9:22 AM
Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR) |
||
utility
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
Wed 06/20 11:17 AM
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Pagecom, Inc. must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/27/2018. (GMR) |
||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice-Other
Tue 06/19 2:58 PM
NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal ; filed by Defendants Annette Jacobs, Sprint Solutions, Inc.. (Hamell, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Tue 06/19 2:51 PM
DECLARATION of Joseph A. Hamell re1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Annette Jacobs, Sprint Solutions, Inc. (Hamell, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 06/19 2:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendants Annette Jacobs, Sprint Solutions, Inc.. (Hamell, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 06/19 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 18 2-08038 5; , filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., Annette Jacobs.(Hamell, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint Exhibit A |