WTA Tour, Inc. et al v. Super Slam Limited et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jed S Rakoff |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-05601 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 09:203 Jurisdiction; amount in controversy |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Apr 02, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 17, 2018 4:37 AM EST |
Petitioner
Steve Simon
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
WTA Tour, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Super Slam Limited
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Ion Tiriac
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |