Orange Middle East and Africa v. The Republic of Equatorial Guinea
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Claude M Hilton |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00749 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 17, 2018 3:58 AM EST |
Defendant
The Republic of Equatorial Guinea
|
|
Plaintiff
Orange Middle East and Africa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 10/22 2:07 PM
ORDER that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/22/18. (pmil, ) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 10/12 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Orange Middle East and Africa(Dry, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Unseal Document
Wed 07/25 10:51 AM
ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Orange Middle East and Africa's10 Motion to Unseal Document is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 07/25/2018. (See order for further details). (acha, ) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Waiver of
Fri 07/20 6:48 PM
Waiver of re10 MOTION to Unseal Document3 MOTION filed by Orange Middle East and Africa Oral Argument by Orange Middle East and Africa (Dry, Michael) |
|
11 | 11
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 07/20 6:47 PM
Memorandum in Support re10 MOTION to Unseal Document3 MOTION filed by Orange Middle East and Africa filed by Orange Middle East and Africa. (Dry, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Unseal Document
Fri 07/20 6:46 PM
MOTION to Unseal Document3 MOTION filed by Orange Middle East and Africa by Orange Middle East and Africa.(Dry, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Fri 06/22 4:06 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Pro hac vice for Dennis Hranitzky. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 6/22/2018. (dest, ) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Fri 06/22 4:05 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Pro hac vice for Michael McGinley. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 6/22/2018. (dest, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/20 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Robinson Vaala on behalf of Orange Middle East and Africa (Vaala, Lindsey) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 06/20 2:42 PM
ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion is hereby GRANTED ; It is further ORDERED that, upon OMEA's filing with the Court of a certification that a bond in the amount of $1,000,000.00, has been issued by an approved surety, the U.S. Marshal's Service is directed to execute a pre-judgment attachment of Boeing 777-200 LR, license CS-TQX and to seize the Aircraft until such time as the Court resolves the merits of the Plaintiff's Complaint and request for recognition of a foreign monetary judgment. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 6/20/2018. (see Order for further details)(dest, ) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/20 2:09 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael McGinley and Certification of Local Counsel Michael S. Dry Filing fee $ 75 Receipt 14683073223 by Orange Middle East and Africa.(dest, ) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt | ||
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/20 2:07 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Dennis Hranitzky and Certification of Local Counsel Michael S. Dry Filing fee $ 75 Receipt 14683073223. by Orange Middle East and Africa.(dest, ) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt | ||
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) 1 - Exparte Document-use ONLY with other selection
Wed 06/20 2:02 PM
EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION for Prejudgment Attachment by Orange Middle East and Africa.(dest, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/20 2:00 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Orange Middle East and Africa. (dest, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/20 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT against The Republic of Equatorial Guinea ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683073224.), filed by Orange Middle East and Africa.(dest, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Receipt |