Falls Church Medical Center, LLC et al v. Oliver et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Henry E Hudson |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00428 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 17, 2018 4:41 AM EST |
Defendant
Anton Bell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael N. Herring
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M. Norman Oliver
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Payne
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Faye O. Prichard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Theophani Stamos
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Colin Stolle
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Tracci
Commonwealth's Attorney for Albemarle County 410 E. High Street
Charlottesville, VA 22902 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Falls Church Medical Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Virginia League for Planned Parenthood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Whole Woman's Health Alliance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Shannon L. Taylor
Terminated: 12/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
All Women's Richmond, Inc.
Terminated: 12/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
1. | Non-doctors can perform first-trimester abortions in Virginia, federal judge rules (washingtonpost.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/08/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
205 | 205
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 07/28 11:08 AM
USCA Mandate re201 Notice of Appeal :This court's order dismissing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42(b) takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (lbre, ) |
|
204 | 204
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 07/28 11:06 AM
ORDER of USCA as to201 Notice of Appeal filed by Whole Woman's Health Alliance, Falls Church Medical Center, LLC, Virginia League for Planned Parenthood, Dr. Jane Doe : Upon consideration of the motion to voluntarily dismiss this case pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, and there appearing no opposition, the court grants the motion. (lbre, ) |