Eckard v. Stringham et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Jones |
Referred: | Brian A Tsuchida |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00898 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 17, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
47 | 47
appeal
Mandate of USCA
Wed 09/30 9:25 AM
MANDATE OF USCA 19-35467 as to41 Notice of Appeal filed by Gabriel Allen Eckard,45 Memorandum/Opinion from USCA. The Judgment from USCA takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. AFFIRMED (CDA) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2020 | ||
46 | 46
1
pgs
appeal
Order of USCA
Tue 09/22 4:24 PM
ORDER OF USCA 19-35467 as to41 Notice of Appeal filed by Gabriel Allen Eckard. (CDA) |
|
Wednesday, June 10, 2020 | ||
45 | 45
appeal
Memorandum/Opinion from USCA
Wed 06/10 4:47 PM
MEMORANDUM FROM USCA 19-35467 (NOT THE MANDATE) as to41 Notice of Appeal filed by Gabriel Allen Eckard. AFFIRMED . (CDA) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
1
pgs
appeal
Order of USCA
Wed 08/28 8:38 AM
ORDER OF USCA 19-35467 as to41 Notice of Appeal filed by Gabriel Allen Eckard. (GT) Modified on 8/28/2019 to correct filing date(GT) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
2
pgs
appeal
Order of USCA
Mon 07/29 11:35 AM
ORDER OF USCA 19-35467 as to41 Notice of Appeal filed by Gabriel Allen Eckard. Prisoner completed authorization fee order . Appellant has been granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this appeal and has completed and filed the required authorization form directing the appropriate prison officials to assess, collect, and forward to the district court the filing and docketing fees for this appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) and (2). (cc: WAWD Finance)(CDA) |
|
Att: 1 Form 4 | ||
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
Time Schedule Order Appeal Number from USCA
Thu 05/30 10:41 AM
TIME SCHEDULE ORDER 19-35467 as to41 Notice of Appeal filed by Gabriel Allen Eckard (CDA) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
Notice of Appeal to Circuit
Wed 05/29 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (IFP granted 7/12/18) re39 Order on Report and Recommendation,40 Judgment by Court, by Plaintiff Gabriel Allen Eckard. (CDA) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
order
Judgment by Court
Fri 05/17 4:12 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. The Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. The motion for summary judgment of Defendants Lisa Anderson, Sarah Blackbum, Breeann Caroway, Kathy Grey, Joan Jaeger, Mark Jones, Sandra Stice, Jeff Stringham, John Vandenberg, and Jack Warner (Dkt.27 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) |
|
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation
Fri 05/17 4:11 PM
ORDER ADOPTING36 Report and Recommendation. The motion for summary judgment of Defendants Lisa Anderson, Sarah Blackbum, Breeann Caroway, Kathy Grey, Joan Jaeger, Mark Jones, Sandra Stice, Jeff Stringham, John Vandenberg, and Jack Warner (Dkt.27 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 05/03 9:16 AM
RESPONSE, by Defendants Lisa Anderson, Sarah Blackburn, Breeann Caroway, Kathy Grey, Joan Jaeger, RN, Mark Jones, Sandra Stice, Jeff Stringham, John Vandenberg, Jack Warner, to37 OBJECTIONS to. (Carr, Douglas) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/15 3:35 PM
Withdraw of Civil Complaint and Request to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Eckard. Noting Date 5/10/2019 (MW) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Report and Recommendation
Mon 03/25 1:05 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Breeann Caroway, Lisa Anderson, John Vandenberg, Kathy Grey, Sandra Stice, Joan Jaeger, RN, Jeff Stringham, Sarah Blackburn, Jack Warner, Mark Jones. Objections to R&R due by 4/15/2019, Noting Date 4/17/2019, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment | ||
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Thu 03/14 3:20 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's34 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Appoint Counsel
Thu 03/14 1:42 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Eckard. Noted by Clerk for 3/29/2019, (TH) |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date
Tue 02/19 11:44 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's32 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt.27 ) by 3/15/2019. Defendants may file their reply by 3/21/2019. The Clerk is directed to re-note Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt.27 ) for 3/22/2019. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time-Other
Fri 01/25 3:53 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Eckard. Noted by Clerk for 2/15/2019. (PM) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice-Other
Fri 01/11 2:49 PM
NOTICE Pro Se Prisoner Dispositive Motion Notice re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendants Lisa Anderson, Sarah Blackburn, Breeann Caroway, Kathy Grey, Joan Jaeger, RN, Mark Jones, Sandra Stice, Jeff Stringham, John Vandenberg, Jack Warner. (Carr, Douglas) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Declaration
Fri 01/11 2:47 PM
DECLARATION of Kathryn Grey in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Lisa Anderson, Sarah Blackburn, Breeann Caroway, Kathy Grey, Joan Jaeger, RN, Mark Jones, Sandra Stice, Jeff Stringham, John Vandenberg, Jack Warner re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Carr, Douglas) |
|
29 | 29
respm
Declaration
Fri 01/11 2:46 PM
DECLARATION of John Vandenberg in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Lisa Anderson, Sarah Blackburn, Breeann Caroway, Kathy Grey, Joan Jaeger, RN, Mark Jones, Sandra Stice, Jeff Stringham, John Vandenberg, Jack Warner re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Carr, Douglas) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Declaration
Fri 01/11 2:44 PM
DECLARATION of Jeffrey Stringham in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Lisa Anderson, Sarah Blackburn, Breeann Caroway, Kathy Grey, Joan Jaeger, RN, Mark Jones, Sandra Stice, Jeff Stringham, John Vandenberg, Jack Warner re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment(Carr, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-2; pp 5-13 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 01/11 2:42 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants Lisa Anderson, Sarah Blackburn, Breeann Caroway, Kathy Grey, Joan Jaeger, RN, Mark Jones, Sandra Stice, Jeff Stringham, John Vandenberg, Jack Warner. Noting Date 2/15/2019, (Carr, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Fri 11/16 11:16 AM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's24 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 11/05 12:43 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants Lisa Anderson, Sarah Blackburn, Breeann Caroway, Kathy Grey, Joan Jaeger, RN, Mark Jones, Sandra Stice, Jeff Stringham, John Vandenberg, Jack Warner, to24 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Carr, Douglas) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 10/22 9:48 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Eckard. Noted by Clerk for 11/9/2018, (SWT) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
service
Waiver of Service
Thu 09/27 11:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Joan Jaeger, RN mailed on 7/13/2018 (Carr, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 09/11 12:25 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery completed by 12/11/2018, Dispositive motions due by 1/11/2019, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (TH) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 09/10 3:44 PM
ANSWER to8 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Lisa Anderson, Sarah Blackburn, Breeann Caroway, Kathy Grey, Joan Jaeger, RN, Mark Jones, Sandra Stice, Jeff Stringham, John Vandenberg, Jack Warner.(Carr, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name
Fri 09/07 6:59 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Eckard. (Docket updated)(ST) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
service
Waiver of Service
Fri 08/10 11:43 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Jack Warner mailed on 7/16/2018 **PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (Carr, Douglas) |
|
18 | 18
service
Waiver of Service
Fri 08/10 11:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant John Vandenberg mailed on 7/13/2018 **PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (Carr, Douglas) |
|
17 | 17
service
Waiver of Service
Fri 08/10 11:41 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Jeff Stringham mailed on 7/13/2018 **PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (Carr, Douglas) |
|
16 | 16
service
Waiver of Service
Fri 08/10 11:40 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Sandra Stice mailed on 7/26/2018 **PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (Carr, Douglas) |
|
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service
Fri 08/10 11:39 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Mark Jones mailed on 7/13/2018 **PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (Carr, Douglas) |
|
14 | 14
service
Waiver of Service
Fri 08/10 11:38 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Kathy Grey mailed on 7/13/2018 **PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (Carr, Douglas) |
|
13 | 13
service
Waiver of Service
Fri 08/10 11:38 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Breeann Caroway mailed on 7/16/2018 **PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (Carr, Douglas) |
|
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service
Fri 08/10 11:37 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Sarah Blackburn mailed on 7/19/2018 **PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (Carr, Douglas) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service
Fri 08/10 11:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Lisa Anderson mailed on 7/16/2018 **PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (Carr, Douglas) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/10 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas Wayne Carr on behalf of Defendants Lisa Anderson, Sarah Blackburn, Breeann Caroway, Kathy Grey, Joan Jaeger, RN, Mark Jones, Sandra Stice, Jeff Stringham, John Vandenberg, Jack Warner. **PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (Carr, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
5
pgs
order
Order Directing Service
Fri 07/13 8:56 AM
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Served by e-mail: Jeff Stringham, John Vandenberg, Joan Jaeger, RN, Kathy Grey, Sgt. Breeann Caroway, Sgt. Sandra Stice, Sarah Blackburn, Lisa Anderson, Jack Warner and Mark Jones, all at MCCC on 7/13/2018. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (SG) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/13 8:51 AM
1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gabriel Eckard. **29 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (SG) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on IFP and Payments re: In Custody Prisoners
Fri 07/13 8:49 AM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (SG) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/11 2:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Gabriel Eckard. **35 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (SG) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Prison Trust Account Statement | ||
misc
IFP Deficiency Corrected
Wed 07/11 2:10 PM
IFP deficiency corrected re4 Letter **DO NOT PRINT** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (SG) |
||
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Wed 07/11 2:01 PM
LETTER from Gabriel Eckard re4 Letter. Notice: Prison trust account will be filed. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (SG) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/11/2018) (SG) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Fri 06/29 9:32 AM
LETTER from Gabriel Eckard re3 IFP Deficiency Letter, **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (SG) |
|
misc
IFP Deficiency Corrected
Fri 06/29 9:33 AM
IFP deficiency corrected re 3 IFP Deficiency Letter, **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (SG) Modified on 6/29/2018 - Entered in error. Deficiency still pending (SG) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 06/29 9:37 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Filer has until 7/20/2018 to correct **DO NOT PRINT** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (SG) |
||
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
utility
IFP Deficiency Letter
Wed 06/20 2:07 PM
LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 7/20/2018 to correct **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (ST) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Application
Wed 06/20 1:55 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Gabriel Eckard **35 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Gabriel Eckard, Prisoner ID: 843345) (ST) |
|
Att: 1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Prison Trust Account |