Bell et al v. King County Public Hospital District #1 et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Marsha J Pechman |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00906 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 17, 2018 12:44 AM PST |
Defendant
Mike Miller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lawton Montgomery
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
King County Public Hospital District #1
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Jane Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Mark Thomasseau
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tamara Sleeter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elizabeth Schaumberg
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Donna Russell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Julia Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vicki Orrico
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Erin Aboudara
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gary Kohlwes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jim Griggs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Peter Evans
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barbara Drennen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bernie Dochnahl
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lisa Brandenburg
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Whitney Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Bell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Bell
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Jeffrey Goon
Terminated: 11/29/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
55 | 55
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 11/14 4:32 PM
ORDER granting Parties'54 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal of All Claims Against Defendants with Prejudice and Without Costs. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
54 | 54
motion
Dismiss
Thu 11/07 11:45 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Against Defendants Pursuant to FRCP 41 , filed by Defendants Erin Aboudara, Whitney Alexander, Lisa Brandenburg, Bernie Dochnahl, Barbara Drennen, Peter Evans, Jeffrey Goon, Jim Griggs, King County Public Hospital District #1, Gary Kohlwes, Mike Miller, Lawton Montgomery, Vicki Orrico, Julia Patterson, Donna Russell, Elizabeth Schaumberg, Tamara Sleeter, Mark Thomasseau. Noting Date 11/7/2019, (Fox, Heath) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |