Omeros Corporation v. Blum
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Jones |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00908 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 17, 2018 1:16 AM PST |
Counter Claimant
Leonard Blum
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Omeros Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Leonard Blum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Omeros Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Stipulated Motion
Thu 10/11 11:50 AM
Stipulated MOTION and (Proposed) Order of Dismissal With Prejudice , filed by Plaintiff Omeros Corporation. Noting Date 10/11/2018, (Fogg, Steven) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 10/11 1:20 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. This case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party pursuant to the parties'25 Stipulation of Dismissal and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (VE) |
||
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion to Seal
Wed 08/15 11:48 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice parties'18 Stipulated Motion to Seal. Should the parties wish to re-file this Motion, the parties are instructed do so within ten (10) days of this Order with additional authority on why the Court should seal information that has already been made public. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Protective Order
Tue 08/07 11:49 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. The parties'22 Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order is granted. (VE) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Stipulated Motion
Mon 08/06 2:45 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff Omeros Corporation. Noting Date 8/6/2018, (Williams, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
21 | 21
order
RAJ Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM)
Mon 08/06 11:04 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 7 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 10/28/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/1/2019, Discovery completed by 7/1/2019, Dispositive motions due by 7/30/2019, Motions in Limine due by 9/30/2019, Pretrial Order due by 10/15/2019, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 10/21/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Declaration
Thu 07/26 3:39 PM
DECLARATION of Marcia Kelbon filed by Counter Defendant Omeros Corporation, Plaintiff Omeros Corporation re18 Stipulated MOTION to Seal (Williams, Todd) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Declaration
Thu 07/26 3:38 PM
DECLARATION of Todd T. Williams filed by Counter Defendant Omeros Corporation, Plaintiff Omeros Corporation re18 Stipulated MOTION to Seal (Williams, Todd) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Stipulated Motion to Seal
Thu 07/26 3:37 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Seal , filed by Counter Defendant Omeros Corporation, Plaintiff Omeros Corporation. Noting Date 7/26/2018, (Williams, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Joint Status Report
Fri 07/20 9:47 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 7. (Williams, Todd) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 07/20 2:06 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Leonard Blum, Counter Claimant Leonard Blum |
|
utility
Note re compliance with LCR 83.2 - Attorney Appearance and With
Mon 07/23 9:58 AM
NOTICE re Document16 : Appearance of attorney Daniel F De La Cruz is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with[LINK:ECF Filing Procedures] . (SWT) |
||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 07/13 10:55 AM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Omeros Corporation (Williams, Todd) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Thu 07/12 4:24 PM
Omeros Corporations ANSWER to8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Leonard Blum by Omeros Corporation.(Williams, Todd) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/26 9:48 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Omeros Corporation (Williams, Todd) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/25 1:18 PM
ORDER re11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jennifer G Redmond for Defendant Leonard Blum, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/25 12:46 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jennifer G. Redmond FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Leonard Blum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5370090 (Devlin, John) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Fri 06/22 10:04 AM
ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/6/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/13/2018, Joint Status Report due by 7/20/2018, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
9 | 9
order
1 - Order
Fri 06/22 10:01 AM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 06/21 4:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Omeros Corporation by Leonard Blum.(Lipscomb, Kelly) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/21 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Todd T Williams on behalf of Plaintiff Omeros Corporation. (Williams, Todd) |
|
6 | 6
utility
Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)
Thu 06/21 12:00 PM
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ST) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 06/21 11:59 AM
Judge Richard A. Jones added. (ST) |
||
utility
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
Thu 06/21 12:01 PM
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/28/2018. (ST) |
||
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Wed 06/20 4:47 PM
DECLARATION of Leonard Blum re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant/Appellant Leonard Blum (Devlin, John) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Wed 06/20 4:46 PM
DECLARATION of Jennifer G. Redmond re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant/Appellant Leonard Blum (Devlin, John) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Wed 06/20 4:45 PM
DECLARATION of John S. Devlin, III re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant/Appellant Leonard Blum(Devlin, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice-Other
Wed 06/20 4:44 PM
NOTICE to Plaintiff re1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant/Appellant Leonard Blum. (Devlin, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 06/20 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18 2-12171 0; , filed by Leonard Blum.(Devlin, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint |