Haskins-Scott v. Commissioner of Social Security
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Christopher P Tuite |
Referred: | Christopher P Tuite |
Case #: | 6:18-cv-00975 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Mon 12/14 4:57 PM
ORDER granting 30 Richard A. Culbertson's Unopposed Request for Authorization to Charge a Reasonable Fee and Memorandum on Reasonable Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 12/14/2020. (CTB) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 12/04 9:43 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Request for Authorization to Charge a Reasonable Fee by Tanisha Susie Haskins-Scott.(Culbertson, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix 1, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix 2, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix 3 | ||
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
8
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Wed 01/29 10:33 AM
ORDER granting 27 Plaintiff's Contested Motion for Attorney's Fees. Plaintiff is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $2,873.10 pursuant to EAJA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 1/29/2020. (AHA) |
|
Friday, November 22, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 11/22 9:23 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Attorney Fees
Wed 11/13 9:31 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Tanisha Susie Haskins-Scott.(Culbertson, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix | ||
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Judgment
Fri 08/23 8:50 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Tanisha Susie Haskins-Scott against Commissioner of Social Security. ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JP) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
12
pgs
order
Opinion and order
Thu 08/22 1:52 PM
ORDER reversing the Commissioner's decision and remanding for further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment in favor of the Plaintiff and to close the case. The matter of fees and costs shall be addressed upon further motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/22/2019. (AMM) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
respoth
Memorandum social security - defendant
Mon 02/25 1:56 PM
MEMORANDUM in support of the Commissioner's decision Joint filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on motion to extend time
Mon 01/28 4:24 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit its Portion of Joint Memorandum of Law to Plaintiff through February 21, 2019, and Extend the Final Due Date of the Joint Memorandum. The Joint Memorandum is due on or before March 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 1/28/2019. (AMM) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Extend time
Mon 01/28 2:31 PM
Unopposed MOTION to extend time to submit its portion of the Joint Memorandum of Law to Plaintiff through February 21, 2019 and extend the finald due date of the Joint Memorandum "Second" by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Tue 01/29 8:59 AM
Set deadlines: Plaintiff memorandum due by 2/21/2019, Joint memorandum due by 3/25/2019 (JP) |
||
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on motion to extend time
Thu 12/20 10:43 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit its Portion of Joint Memorandum of Law to Plaintiff through January 22, 2019, and Extend the Final Due Date of the Joint Memorandum. The Joint Memorandum is due on or before February 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 12/20/2018. (AMM) |
|
utility
Set/reset deadlines/hearings-PUBLIC
Thu 12/20 4:39 PM
Set/reset deadlines: Joint memorandum due by 2/21/2019 (DMA) |
||
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extend time
Wed 12/19 3:32 PM
Unopposed MOTION to extend time to submit its portion of the Joint Memorandum of Law to Plaintiff through January 22, 2019 and extend the final due date of the Joint Memorandum by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
utility
Add and Terminate Judges Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 09/25 10:42 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 6:18-cv-975-Orl-CPT. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite no longer assigned to the case. (MAA) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 09/24 10:53 AM
ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 9/24/2018. (SC) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order - Social Security
Wed 09/19 9:56 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties Joint Memorandum is due on or before 2/1/2019. See attached order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/19/2018. (AMM) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Social security transcript
Tue 09/11 2:17 PM
SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings re14 Answer to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix, | ||
Att: 6 Appendix, | ||
Att: 7 Appendix, | ||
Att: 8 Appendix, | ||
Att: 9 Appendix, | ||
Att: 10 Appendix, | ||
Att: 11 Appendix | ||
15 | 15
misc
Consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 09/11 2:15 PM
CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/11 2:14 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on motion for extension of time to answer
Thu 08/30 12:20 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Defendant's answer or response is due on or before September 27, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/30/2018. (AMM) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/27 3:29 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time up to and including September 27, 2018 to File Answer re1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. Modified on 8/27/2018 (DMA) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
service
Proof of service
Thu 08/09 2:13 PM
PROOF of service as to Attorney General via certified mail on 7/16/2018 by Tanisha Susie Haskins-Scott (DMA) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
service
Proof of service
Fri 07/13 11:37 AM
PROOF of service as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, SSA, via certified mail on 7/10/2018 by Tanisha Susie Haskins-Scott (DMA) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/12 1:00 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 6:18-cv-975-Orl-18CPT. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (NAS) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons returned executed as to USA
Fri 07/06 4:06 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Tanisha Susie Haskins-Scott. Commissioner of Social Security/U.S. Attorney served on 6/29/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (DMA) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Thu 07/05 3:16 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tanisha Susie Haskins-Scott. Related case(s): no (Culbertson, Richard) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons issued as to USA
Mon 06/25 11:23 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (DMA) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on motion for leave to proceed In forma pauperis
Fri 06/22 3:52 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/22/2018. (Smith, Thomas) |
|
4 | 4
order
Related case order and track 1 notice
Fri 06/22 3:47 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 6/22/2018. (counsel emailed)(AKC) |
|
3 | 3
order
SS Standing Order
Fri 06/22 3:38 PM
ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/2010. (DMA) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/22 3:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tanisha Susie Haskins-Scott. (DMA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/22 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Tanisha Susie Haskins-Scott.(DMA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |