BIT HOLDINGS FIFTY-ONE, INC. v. ULTIMATE FRANCHISES, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Tonianne J Bongiovanni |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-11010 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 22, 2018 4:20 AM EST |
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-5
|
|
Defendant
ST. GREGORY DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ULTIMATE FRANCHISES, INC.
|
|
Notice Only
arbtre
|
|
Plaintiff
BIT HOLDINGS FIFTY-ONE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment - Default
Thu 09/05 4:23 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Entered in favor of BIT HOLDINGS FIFTY-ONE, INC. against ULTIMATE FRANCHISES, INC. in the amount of $878,480.61 plus $400.00 in costs, all other relief not expressly granted is Denied ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 9/5/2019. (km) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 05/30 10:50 AM
ORDER that St. Gregory's Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the entry of this Order to file an Amended Complaint consistent with the Court's ruling. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 5/30/2019. (mmh) |
|
15 | 15
14
pgs
order
Opinion
Thu 05/30 10:45 AM
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 5/30/2019. (mmh) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 03/01 1:25 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ultimate Franchises, Inc. by BIT HOLDINGS FIFTY-ONE, INC.. Responses due by 3/18/2019(HAWORTH, DAVID) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of David Haworth, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Paul Faris, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Wayne Kasbar, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 03/01 1:56 PM
Set Deadlines as to14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ultimate Franchises, Inc. . Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) |
||
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
qc
QC - Improper Default Request
Mon 01/28 10:57 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Default Judgment submitted by David Haworth, Esq. on 12/04/2018 cannot be granted as requested because it is beyond the scope of what the clerk can grant. Counsel is advised to refile a Motion for Default Judgment to be heard by Judge Brian R. Martinotti. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jem) |
||
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Request for Default
Tue 12/04 10:51 AM
Request for Default by BIT HOLDINGS FIFTY-ONE, INC. against Ultimate Franchises, Inc..(HAWORTH, DAVID) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of D. Haworth re military service, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of David Haworth, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Paul Faris, | ||
Att: 4 Faris Ex. 1, part 1, | ||
Att: 5 Faris Ex. 1, part 2, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of Wayne Kasbar, | ||
Att: 7 Kasbar, Ex. 1, part 1, | ||
Att: 8 Kasbar Ex. 1, part 2, | ||
Att: 9 Kasbar Exs 2-3, | ||
Att: 10 Default Judgment, | ||
Att: 11 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
Mon 10/29 3:14 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ST. GREGORY DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC re10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (SAGER, DAVID) |
|
Att: 1 Supplemental Declaration of James Jagers | ||
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Mon 10/22 5:32 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIT HOLDINGS FIFTY-ONE, INC. re10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (HAWORTH, DAVID) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of D. Haworth, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Fri 10/05 12:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by ST. GREGORY DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC. Responses due by 10/22/2018(SAGER, DAVID) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of James Jagers, | ||
Att: 3 5 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 10/05 1:24 PM
Set Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) |
||
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 09/21 9:54 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time within which Defendant can answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 10/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/21/2018. (km) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Thu 09/20 2:54 PM
STIPULATION and Order Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by ST. GREGORY DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC. (SAGER, DAVID) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 09/13 4:06 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ULTIMATE FRANCHISES, INC. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (jem) |
||
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Request for Default
Tue 09/11 12:14 PM
Request for Default by BIT HOLDINGS FIFTY-ONE, INC. against Ultimate Franchises, Inc..(HAWORTH, DAVID) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of David A. Haworth with Ex. A, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 08/07 2:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Ultimate Franchises, Inc. on 08/02/2018, filed by BIT HOLDINGS FIFTY-ONE, INC.. (HAWORTH, DAVID) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 08/02 1:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on St. Gregory Development Group on 07/27/2018, filed by BIT HOLDINGS FIFTY-ONE, INC.. (HAWORTH, DAVID) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certification
Tue 06/26 11:39 AM
Certification of DAVID A. HAWORTH PURSUANT TO L.CIV.R. 201.1(d)(3) on behalf of BIT HOLDINGS FIFTY-ONE, INC.. (HAWORTH, DAVID) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/26 8:41 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ST. GREGORY DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC, ULTIMATE FRANCHISES, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/26 8:36 AM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jem) |
||
utility
Case Referred to Arbitration
Tue 06/26 8:39 AM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jem) |
||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/25 4:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIT HOLDINGS FIFTY-ONE, INC. identifying None. as Corporate Parent.. (HAWORTH, DAVID) |
|
1 | 1
140
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/25 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT against ST. GREGORY DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC, ULTIMATE FRANCHISES, INC., JOHN DOES 1-5 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8838495), filed by BIT HOLDINGS FIFTY-ONE, INC..(HAWORTH, DAVID) |