Zeitler et al v. Pultman et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-10910
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-10910
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | Joan N Feeney |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01088 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Matthew A. Pultman
439 East Street
Dedham, MA 02026 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Keren R. Pultman
439 East Street
Dedham, MA 02026 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chik Chak Food Truck, LLC
374 Boylston Street
Brookline, MA 02445 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Zeitler
427 Lincoln Street
Waltham, MA 02451 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ariel Kendall
166 Terrace Street Unit 411
Boston, MA 02120 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 11/02 8:17 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 18-1088 Dismissed Complaint (chy) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 11/02 8:18 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1088 Closed (chy) |
||
Saturday, October 20, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 10/21 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 10/20/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 10/18 11:36 AM
Order dated 10/18/2018 Re:17 Scheduling Order dated 9/13/2018 . UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE DISMISSAL OF THE DEBTORS' CHAPTER 13 CASE, THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ADVERSARY PROCEEDING IS DISMISSED. (chy) |
|
Saturday, September 15, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 09/16 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 09/15/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 09/13 11:02 AM
Scheduling Order dated 9/13/2018 RE:15 Amended Complaint. Initial Conference in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) by 10/15/2018. Joint Discovery Report due by 11/2/2018. Discovery due by 12/14/2018. Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 2/15/2019. Deadline for Dispositive Motions and Discovery Motions 1/18/2019. SEE SCHEDULING ORDER FOR FULL TEXT. (chy) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 09/12 6:22 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint with certificate of service filed by Keren R. Pultman, Matthew A. Pultman RE:15 Amended Complaint. (Madoff, David) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/27 1:59 PM
Amended Complaint by Justin Kesselman on behalf of Chik Chak Food Truck, LLC, Ariel Kendall, Barbara Zeitler against Keren R. Pultman, Matthew A. Pultman . (Kesselman, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (operating agreement) | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B (investor participation agreement) | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C (event partnership agreement) | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D (Philabos membership email) | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Exhibit E (Chik Chak investment email) | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F (demand letter) | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G (Stipulation and Order) | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H (Injunction) | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I (Eastern Bank statement) | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J (AMEXpoints email) | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K (coupon email) | ||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 08/23 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 08/22/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Generic Motion
Mon 08/20 12:01 PM
Order dated 8/20/2018 Re:9 Motion filed by Defendants Keren R. Pultman, Matthew A. Pultman to Set Aside Entry of Notice of Default. HEARING HELD. FOR THE REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD, THE MOTION IS GRANTED. THE PARTIES AGREED IN OPEN COURT THAT CHIK CHAK FOOD TRUCK, LLC SHALL NO LONGER BE A DEFENDANT BUT MAY BE INCLUDED AS A PLAINTIFF. AN AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED BY AUGUST 27, 2018 AND AN ANSWER SHALL BE FILED WITHIN TEN DAYS OF THE FILING OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. (chy) |
|
Sunday, August 12, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Mon 08/13 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Notice Date 08/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing
Fri 08/10 9:52 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing filed by Defendants Keren R. Pultman, Matthew A. Pultman (Madoff, David) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
court
Hearing Scheduled (Forms Attached)
Thu 08/09 9:25 PM
Hearing Scheduled for 8/20/2018 at 10:45 AM at Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re:9 Motion filed by Defendants Keren R. Pultman, Matthew A. Pultman to Set Aside Entry of Notice of Default. Objections due by 8/17/2018 at 3:00 PM.(pd) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Miscellaneous Motion
Fri 08/03 1:41 PM
Motion filed by Defendants Keren R. Pultman, Matthew A. Pultman to Set Aside Entry of Notice of Default with certificate of service. (Madoff, David) |
|
8 | 8
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 08/03 12:22 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Chik Chak Food Truck, LLC. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
15
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/25 5:45 PM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by Keren R. Pultman, Matthew A. Pultman RE:1 Complaint. (Madoff, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 06/27 10:45 AM
Summons Service Executed on Chik Chak Food Truck, LLC 6/27/2018 (Kesselman, Justin) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 06/27 10:44 AM
Summons Service Executed on Matthew A. Pultman 6/27/2018 (Kesselman, Justin) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 06/27 10:43 AM
Summons Service Executed on Keren R. Pultman 6/27/2018 (Kesselman, Justin) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Mon 06/25 3:08 PM
Summons Issued on Chik Chak Food Truck, LLC Answer Due 7/25/2018; Keren R. Pultman Answer Due 7/25/2018; Matthew A. Pultman Answer Due 7/25/2018. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (chy) |
|
2 | 2
court
Add Attorney for Debtor
Mon 06/25 3:06 PM
Attorney John A. Ullian for Defendants Keren R. Pultman, Matthew A. Pultman added to Adversary Proceeding 1:18-ap-1088 pursuant MLBR 9010-2. (chy) |
|
1 | 1
33
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/25 1:57 PM
Adversary case 18-01088 Complaint by Barbara Zeitler, Ariel Kendall against Matthew A. Pultman, Keren R. Pultman, Chik Chak Food Truck, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))(Kesselman, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Action Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Operating Agreement) | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B (Investor Participation Agreement) | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C (Event Partnership Agreement) | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D (Philabos Membership Email) | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E (Chik Chak Email) | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F (Demand on LLC) | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G (Stipulated Order) | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H (Injunction) | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I (Eastern Bank Statement) | ||
Att: 11 10 pgs Exhibit J (AMEX Points Email) | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K (Coupon Email) |