QUARTERMAN v. GAINESVILLE LODGE, LLC
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Walker |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00120 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 24, 2018 3:30 AM EST |
Defendant
GAINESVILLE LODGE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LANIE QUARTERMAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 11/08 8:08 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by LANIE QUARTERMAN. (KERR, JESSICA) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Mon 09/10 12:10 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to 11 Order Dismissing Case signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/10/18. The parties are ordered to comply with their settlement agreement. The court reserves jurisdiction to enforce the order to comply with the settlement agreement. All claims in this case are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. (tss) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 09/10 11:59 AM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/10/18. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment and close the case. (tss) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 09/10 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by LANIE QUARTERMAN (KERR, JESSICA) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 09/10 8:52 AM
Reset Deadlines: GAINESVILLE LODGE, LLC answer due 9/7/2018. (bkp) |
||
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 08/27 4:41 PM
ORDER GRANTING 8 THIRD MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by GAINESVILLE LODGE, LLC Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/27/18. Answer due by 9/7/2018 . (tss) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/27 3:08 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Complaint , Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GAINESVILLE LODGE, LLC. (HULTMAN, LORRAINE) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/13 1:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING SECOND EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. (Answer due by 8/27/2018 ). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/13/2018. (kdm) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/13 1:02 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by GAINESVILLE LODGE, LLC. (HULTMAN, LORRAINE) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/19 1:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING 4 EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. (Answer due by 8/13/2018 ). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/19/2018. (kdm) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/18 2:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (DKT1) by GAINESVILLE LODGE, LLC. (JOSHI, NIKHIL) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/12 8:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by LANIE QUARTERMAN. All Defendants. (KERR, JESSICA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Returned Executed | ||
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/28 7:59 AM
Summons Issued as to GAINESVILLE LODGE, LLC. (bkp) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/27 5:18 PM
COMPLAINT against GAINESVILLE LODGE, LLC,a Florida limited liability company, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4216603.), filed by LANIE QUARTERMAN, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated,. (KERR, JESSICA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |