Huff v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas M Parker |
Referred: | Thomas M Parker |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-01457 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 11/21 8:25 AM
Stipulation and Order of case dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Related document(s)18 . Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 11/21/2018. (D,JJ) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Tue 11/20 11:16 AM
Joint Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Loretta Huff. (Gillissie, Rebecca) |
|
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to extend deadlines
Wed 11/14 9:49 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's17 Motion for extension of time to file Brief on the Merits until November 19, 2018. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 11/14/2018. (D,JJ) |
||
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension (of deadlines)
Tue 11/13 8:54 PM
Motion for extension of Time to File Brief on the Merits until November 19, 2018 filed by Plaintiff Loretta Huff. (Gillissie, Rebecca) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to extend deadlines
Tue 10/30 8:31 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's16 Motion for extension of time until November 12, 2018 to file Brief on the Merits. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 10/30/2018.(D,JJ) |
||
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension (of deadlines)
Mon 10/29 9:35 PM
Motion for extension of Time to File Brief on the Merits until November 12, 2018 filed by Plaintiff Loretta Huff. (Gillissie, Rebecca) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Consent to Magistrate Judge
Tue 09/25 10:58 AM
Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Thomas M. Parker for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/25/2018. (K,K) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Tue 09/25 11:04 AM
Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Dan Aaron Polster terminated. Related document(s)15 . (D,Ky) |
||
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
soc_doc
Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration
Thu 09/13 2:47 PM
Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Related document(s)13 . (Asher, Ruchi) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/13 2:46 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Asher, Ruchi) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
service
Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant
Wed 08/01 3:50 PM
Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon U.S. Attorney on 7/19/2018, by FedEx upon Attorney General on 7/23/18 and Regional Counsel on 7/31/18. Filed on behalf of Loretta Huff. Related document(s)11 . (W,Jo) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Wed 07/11 1:18 PM
Original Summons, Complaint, Initial Order and Magistrate Consent Package issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel.. (D,JJ) |
|
Att: 1 USM-285 Forms | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy
Wed 07/11 1:16 PM
Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,JJ) |
|
9 | 9
order
Magistrate Judges Initial Order
Wed 07/11 1:14 PM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 7/11/2018. (D,JJ) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
oth_doc
Supplement
Tue 07/10 2:35 PM
Supplement to Complaint, - Summons - Social Security Adminstration, filed by Loretta Huff. Related document(s)1 . (Gillissie, Rebecca) |
|
7 | 7
oth_doc
Supplement
Tue 07/10 2:34 PM
Supplement to Complaint, - Summons - Asst. US Attorney, filed by Loretta Huff. Related document(s)1 . (Gillissie, Rebecca) |
|
6 | 6
oth_doc
Supplement
Tue 07/10 2:33 PM
Supplement to Complaint, - Summons - US Attorney, filed by Loretta Huff. Related document(s)1 . (Gillissie, Rebecca) |
|
order
Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis
Tue 07/10 1:28 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Amended Motion to proceed in forma pauperis . Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 7/10/2018.(D,JJ) |
||
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/09 2:33 PM
Amended Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Loretta Huff. Related document(s)4 . (Gillissie, Rebecca) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 06/28 7:17 PM
Order . Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended IFP application within 10 days of the date of this order, on or before July 9, 2018. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 6/28/2018. Related document2 . (G,CA) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order
Wed 06/27 9:53 AM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (W,Jo) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 06/27 9:29 AM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Loretta Huff. (Gillissie, Rebecca) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/27 9:19 AM
Complaint against Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Loretta Huff. (Gillissie, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons - Attorney General, | ||
Att: 3 Summons - US Attorney, | ||
Att: 4 Summons - Commissioner of SSA, | ||
Att: 5 USM-285 - Attorney General, | ||
Att: 6 USM-285 - US Attorney, | ||
Att: 7 USM-285 - Commissioner of SSA | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Wed 06/27 9:50 AM
Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (W,Jo) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/27 9:52 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (W,Jo) |
||
order
Automatic Reference of Administrative Action
Wed 06/27 9:54 AM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. (W,Jo) |