Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Fernando J Gaitan, Jr
Case #: 4:18-cv-00499
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2018
Terminated:Nov 07, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 25, 2018 2:45 AM CST
Defendant
Ditech Financial, LLC
120 S. Central Ave.
Clayton, MO 63105
Represented By
Megan R Stumph-Turner
Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, Llc - Kcmo
contact info
Plaintiff
Lela Marie Reffett
11329 N. Ewing Ave.
Kansas City, MO 64156
Represented By
Chelsea S. Herring Springer
The Law Offices Of Tracy L. Robinson, Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Michael Reffett
11329 N. Ewing Ave.
Kansas City, MO 64156
Represented By
Chelsea S. Herring Springer
The Law Offices Of Tracy L. Robinson, Lc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 09/06/2018
221 Bolivar St.
Jefferson City, MO 63105
Represented By
Guillermo G. Zorogastua
Polsinelli Pc - Kcmo
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, November 07, 2018
17 17 order Clerk's Order of Dismissal Wed 11/07 4:05 PM
Clerk's ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to Ditech Financial, LLC, pursuant to16 Stipulation of Dismissal. This is a text entry only. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 11/07 2:34 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal WITH PREJUDICE WITH DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC by Lela Marie Reffett, Ryan Michael Reffett. (Herring Springer, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
15 15 order Order Fri 09/28 12:15 PM
ORDER - On 9/26/18, this case was reported settled by the Notice of Settlement that was filed. The parties are directed to file either a stipulation of dismissal or a status report discussing settlement progress on or before 11/12/2018. Signed on 9/28/18 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 09/26 12:31 PM
NOTICE of settlement WITH DITECH FINANCIAL, LLC and REQUEST FOR 45-DAY STAY TO FINALIZE SETTLEMENT AND FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Lela Marie Reffett, Ryan Michael Reffett (Herring Springer, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 06, 2018
13 13 order Clerk's Order of Dismissal Thu 09/06 11:47 AM
Clerk's ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC only. Pursuant to12 Stipulation of Dismissal. This is a text entry only. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/04 10:52 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal WITH EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC by Lela Marie Reffett, Ryan Michael Reffett. (Herring Springer, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
notice Notice of Filing Wed 07/25 1:04 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 07/24 3:34 PM
NOTICE of settlement WITH EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC and REQUEST FOR 45-DAY STAY TO FINALIZE SETTLEMENT AND FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Lela Marie Reffett, Ryan Michael Reffett (Herring Springer, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 20, 2018
10 10 order Rule 16 Notice Fri 07/20 1:31 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/4/2018. Signed on 7/20/2018 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 07/19 4:27 PM
ORDER granting5 Equifax Information Services, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 8/22/2018. Signed on 7/19/2018 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Rosa, Patricia)
Related: [-]
8 8 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Thu 07/19 4:25 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Megan R Stumph-Turner on behalf of Defendant Ditech Financial, LLC.(Stumph-Turner, Megan)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/19 4:22 PM
Ditech Financial, LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint, on behalf of Ditech Financial, LLC.(Attorney Megan R Stumph-Turner added to party Ditech Financial, LLC(pty:dft))(Stumph-Turner, Megan)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Thu 07/19 3:30 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 07/19 3:29 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer re1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/2/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Attorney Guillermo G. Zorogastua added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, July 05, 2018
4 4 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Thu 07/05 2:41 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Ryan Michael Reffett, Lela Marie Reffett. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018.(Herring Springer, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt
3 3 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Thu 07/05 2:38 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Ryan Michael Reffett, Lela Marie Reffett. Ditech Financial, LLC served on 7/2/2018, answer due 7/23/2018.(Herring Springer, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt
Thursday, June 28, 2018
2 2 notice Notice of MAPN Thu 06/28 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/28 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Ditech Financial, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC filed by Chelsea S. Herring Springer on behalf of Ryan Michael Reffett, Lela Marie Reffett. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-5834791. Service due by 9/26/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Herring Springer, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A - I,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
service Summons Issued Thu 06/28 1:46 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ditech Financial, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]