Walgreen Co. v. Theranos, Inc.
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Andrews |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00989 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 01, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 29, 2018 4:30 AM EST |
Defendant
Theranos, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walgreen Co.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment
Mon 10/01 3:02 PM
ORDER: Walgreens' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Defendant Theranos, Inc. is hereby ordered to pay Plaintiff Walgreens $5,000,000.00 in damages, along with prejudgment interest at a rate of 7.5% through this date, and post-judgment interest of 2.5% through the date of payment. Final judgment is entered in favor of Walgreens and against Defendant Theranos, Inc. (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/1/2018. (nms) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 10/01 10:20 AM
RESPONSE to15 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Theranos, Inc.. (Dean, G.) Modified on 10/1/2018 (nms) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Redacted Document
Mon 09/24 11:03 AM
REDACTED VERSION of17 Declaration of Kristen R. Seeger, by Walgreen Co..(Shannon, Kevin) Modified on 9/24/2018 (nms) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
18 | 18
misc
Redacted Document
Mon 09/24 11:00 AM
REDACTED VERSION of16 Opening Brief in Support by Walgreen Co.. (Shannon, Kevin) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Declaration
Mon 09/17 5:57 PM
[SEALED] DECLARATION re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Kristen R. Seeger) by Walgreen Co..(Shannon, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
16 | 16
respm
Brief - Opening Brief in Support
Mon 09/17 5:55 PM
[SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Walgreen Co..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/1/2018. (Shannon, Kevin) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 09/17 5:53 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Walgreen Co..(Shannon, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order - General
Mon 09/10 3:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 9/17/2018 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2018. (nms) |
|
13 | 13
order
Oral Order
Mon 09/10 11:45 AM
ORAL ORDER: The request to convert the Rule 16 conference to a telephonic one (D.I.12 ) is GRANTED. The Plaintiff shall coordinate the call to Chambers. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2018. (nms) |
|
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Mon 09/10 2:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 9/10/2018. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) (ksr, ) |
||
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Fri 09/07 4:21 PM
Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kevin R. Shannon regarding request for Rule 16 conference be held telephonically - re10 Order Setting Scheduling Conference. (Shannon, Kevin) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 08/31 11:46 AM
PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Walgreen Co.. (Silverstein, Alan) Modified on 8/31/2018 (nms) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Scheduling Conference
Tue 07/31 4:07 PM
Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/10/2018, at 2:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/31/2018. (nms) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/24 9:15 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint, by Theranos, Inc..(Dean, G.) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Tue 07/24 2:58 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kristen R. Seeger and David A. Gordon for Walgreen Co. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg) |
||
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Tue 07/17 10:43 AM
SO ORDERED, re8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Gordon and Kristen R. Seeger, filed by Walgreen Co.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/17/2018. (nms) |
||
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/13 4:03 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Gordon and Kristen R. Seeger - filed by Walgreen Co.. (Shannon, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
5
pgs
misc
Redacted Document
Tue 07/10 1:06 PM
REDACTED VERSION of2 Complaint, by Walgreen Co.. (Shannon, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/05 4:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walgreen Co.. Theranos, Inc. served on 7/3/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Silverstein, Alan) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/05 12:44 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) |
||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 07/03 2:58 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/3/18. (sar) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
Mon 07/02 4:27 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co. filed by Walgreen Co.. (sar) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Magistrate Consent Forms
Mon 07/02 4:25 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/02 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT filed against Theranos, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number DEX029969.) - filed by Walgreen Co..(sar) |
|
Att: 1 Acknowledgement of Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
motion
Seal
Mon 07/02 4:18 PM
MOTION For Leave To File Complaint Under Seal - filed by Walgreen Co..(sar) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/02 4:27 PM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Theranos, Inc. on 7/2/2018. (sar) |
||
utility
Remark
Tue 07/03 8:07 AM
Remark: Exit Copies sent to Duty Judge (LPS) (sar) |