Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 216.189.180.220
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Federico A Moreno |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-22647 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:0101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 26, 2018 3:58 AM EST |
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 216.189.180.220
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 01/31 5:08 PM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL and ORDER DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT. Closing Case. Motions terminated:11 Plaintiff's MOTION For Reconsideration re8 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC,12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing re11 Plaintiff's MOTION For Reconsideration re8 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, ,10 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmd) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Mon 01/28 6:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of John Doe by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (DeMaria, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Hearing
Tue 11/06 5:33 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing re11 Plaintiff's MOTION For Reconsideration re8 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, ,10 Response to Order to Show Cause by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(DeMaria, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 10/23 3:34 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION For Reconsideration re8 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(DeMaria, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
10 | 10
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Tue 10/23 3:19 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re9 Order to Show Cause by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (DeMaria, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 10/17 5:04 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/29/2018. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (koa) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 10/17 4:56 PM
ORDER DENYING6 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference; and DENYING7 Plaintiff's Application of Extension of Time within which to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (koa) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 09/27 5:12 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time within which to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 10/11/2018(DeMaria, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/16 5:35 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(DeMaria, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Errata B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Wed 07/11 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) as to John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 216.189.180.220 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (DeMaria, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Form AO 120/121
Tue 07/03 2:55 PM
FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (lh) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint and Exhibits | ||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/02 6:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (DeMaria, Joseph) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 07/02 10:34 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (lh) |
|
1 | 1 COMPLAINT - Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 216.189.180.220. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10780734, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(DeMaria, Joseph) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |