RICE v. BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | John Michael Vazquez |
Referred: | Steven C Mannion |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-11312 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 29, 2018 4:26 AM EST |
Defendant
BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAYER OY
|
|
Defendant
BAYER PHARMA AG
|
|
Plaintiff
KERI RICE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
utility
Remark (public)
Wed 07/25 1:12 PM
Remark: Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in the Southern District of New York as case 1:18-cv-06638, filed 7/24/18. (gh, ) |
||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Thu 07/19 9:12 AM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of New York. (CTO-16 MDL 2767 Judge Paul A. Engelmayer) (gh, ) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Thu 07/19 9:13 AM
Case extracted via ECF to Southern District of New York. (gh, ) |
||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/02 4:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. identifying Schering Berlin Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DONATH, JONATHAN) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/02 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, case number BER L 3943 18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8857870), filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC..(DONATH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 07/03 9:09 AM
Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (mfr) |