Wheatley v. Board of Education of the Tiffin City School District et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Helmick |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01517 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex) |
Case Filed: | Jul 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 30, 2018 3:24 AM EST |
Defendant
Board of Education of the Tiffin City School District
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Vicki A. Wheatley
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Tiffin City School District
Terminated: 11/16/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tiffin City Schools
Terminated: 11/16/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 18, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 09/18 8:57 AM
Order of Case Dismissal with prejudice. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/18/2019. (S,AL) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
notice
Stipulation (atty event)
Tue 09/17 9:15 PM
Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Vicki A. Wheatley. (Bernard, Dale) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
order
Order
Fri 08/30 8:15 AM
Order [non-document] The parties having indicated that this case is settled, ordered that a dismissal entry to be filed in 30 days. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 8/30/2019. (S,AL) |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Status Report (atty event)
Wed 08/28 2:31 PM
Joint Status Report filed by Board of Education of the Tiffin City School District. (Freeze, Bartholomew) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to continue
Thu 05/23 1:35 PM
Marginal Entry Order: granting the parties joint motion to continue the case deadlines. Deadlines and pretrial conference scheduled for 5/29/2019 vacated. Parties to file a joint status report by 8/30/19. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 5/23/2019.(S,AL) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Continue
Thu 05/09 4:13 PM
Joint Motion to continue Case Deadlines Ninety Days filed by Defendant Board of Education of the Tiffin City School District. (Freeze, Bartholomew) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Minute Order _ Case Management Conference
Fri 12/14 3:35 PM
Order of Case Management Conference held on 12/13/2018. Case is assigned to the standard track. Time: 10 minutes. Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 3/8/2019. Telephone Conference set for 5/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. The court will initiate the phone call. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/14/2018. (S,AL) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Thu 12/06 3:44 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Board of Education of the Tiffin City School District. (Freeze, Bartholomew) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 11/27 2:44 PM
Answer to17 Amended complaint, filed by Board of Education of the Tiffin City School District. (Freeze, Bartholomew) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 11/13 11:14 PM
First Amended complaint against Board of Education of the Tiffin City School District. Filed by Vicki A. Wheatley. (Bernard, Dale) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A"--EEOC Charge, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B"--EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "C"--EEOC Charge, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit "D"--EEOC Notice of Right to Sue | ||
16 | 16
notice
Stipulation
Tue 11/13 9:44 PM
Proposed Stipulation of the Parties filed by Vicki A. Wheatley. (Bernard, Dale) |
|
15 | 15
minutes
~Util - Set Hearings Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
Tue 11/13 1:49 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: conference to be held on 12/13/2018 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 210 before Judge Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick.(S,AL) |
|
Att: 1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
Tue 11/13 9:34 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Board of Education of the Tiffin City School District answer due 12/2/2018. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/13/2018.(S,AL) |
|
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension (answer complaint)
Fri 11/09 12:19 PM
Motion for extension of time until December 2, 2018 to answer , move, or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Board of Education of the Tiffin City School District. (Freeze, Bartholomew) |
|
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to extend deadlines
Fri 11/02 9:27 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting11 the plaintiff's motion for an additional extension of time until November 14, 2018 within which to serve the School District Defendants. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/2/2018.(S,AL) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension (of deadlines)
Wed 10/31 4:44 PM
Consent Motion for extension of Time to Serve Defendants Tiffin City School District and Tiffin City Schools until November 14, 2018 filed by Plaintiff Vicki A. Wheatley. (Bernard, Dale) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to amend complaint
Tue 10/23 3:37 PM
Marginal Entry Order granting the consent motion of the parties for leave to amend the complaint. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/23/2018.(S,AL) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Amend Complaint
Mon 10/22 12:21 PM
Consent Motion to amend complaint filed by Plaintiff Vicki A. Wheatley. (Bernard, Dale) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
Thu 10/18 2:28 PM
Marginal Entry Order granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Board of Education of the Tiffin City School District, Tiffin City School District, and Tiffin City Schools answer due 11/11/2018. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/18/2018.(SG,D) |
|
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for extension of time (other)
Thu 10/18 1:55 PM
Marginal Entry Order granting plaintiff's motion for an extension of time until 10/31/2018 to serve defendants Tiffin City School District and Tiffin City Schools.5 Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/18/2018.(S,AL) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension (answer complaint)
Wed 10/17 9:26 AM
Motion for extension of time until November 11, 2018 to answer filed by Defendant Board of Education of the Tiffin City School District. (Freeze, Bartholomew) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension (other)
Mon 10/01 12:19 PM
Consent Motion for extension of time until October 31, 2018 to to Serve Defendants Tiffin City School District and Tiffin City Schools filed by Plaintiff Vicki A. Wheatley. (Bernard, Dale) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 09/05 11:20 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Vicki A. Wheatley. Board of Education of the Tiffin City School District waiver sent on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018 filed on behalf of Vicki A. Wheatley (Bernard, Dale) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice
Thu 07/05 3:29 PM
Notice of Filing of Redacted Exhibits A, B and C to Complaint filed by Vicki A. Wheatley.Related document(s)1 .(Bernard, Dale) |
|
Att: 1 15 pgs Exhibit "A" (redacted)--EEOC Charge, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" (redacted)--EEOC Charge, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "C" (redacted)--EEOC Charge | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake
Thu 07/05 10:14 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Thu 07/05 9:49 AM
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,L) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/05 9:49 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,L) |
||
oth_evt
Notice re Prompt Service
Thu 07/05 10:15 AM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,L) |
||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/03 6:43 PM
Complaint with jury demand against BOARD OF EDUCATION OF THE TIFFIN CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT, TIFFIN CITY BOARD OF EDUCATION, TIFFIN CITY SCHOOL BOARD, TIFFIN CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT, TIFFIN CITY SCHOOLS, TIFFIN CITY SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION, Tiffin City School District Board of Education. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8788263.. Filed by Vicki A. Wheatley. (Bernard, Dale) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A"--EEOC Charge, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B"--EEOC Charge, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "C"--EEOC Charge, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit "D"--EEOC Right to Sue, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit "E"--EEOC Right to Sue, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit "F"--EEOC Right to Sue, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet |