Hager v. 3M Company et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Joan N Ericksen |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-01868 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 30, 2018 3:45 AM CST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Arizant Healthcare, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Laverne Hager
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment 3M ONLY (Clerk's Office Only)
Thu 08/08 10:59 AM
JUDGMENT and CLERK'S NOTICE ON APPEAL (JAT) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Attorney - FLN Case Reassigned
Fri 08/17 10:25 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-01868-JNE-DTS . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JAT) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
MDL Pretrial Order
Tue 07/03 2:31 PM
MDL PRETRIAL ORDER No 1. Establishing Procedures. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016. (MMP) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/03 2:30 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY. COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2666 (JNE/FLN). Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2666-JNE-FLN. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Bair Hugger MDL website at:[LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Bair-Hugger/index.shtml] . (MMP) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/03 2:28 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (MMP) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 07/03 2:27 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 18-cv-1868 (JNE/FLN). (MMP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/03 1:44 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6206342) filed by Laverne Hager. Filer requests summons issued. (Hodges, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |