Zimmerman v. Towery et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-03915 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1443(1) Rent, Lease & Ejectment |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 26, 2018 12:41 AM PST |
Defendant
Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Towery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ben Zimmerman
501 W. Glenoaks Blvd #604
Glendale, CA 91202 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Sunday, December 02, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Sun 12/02 4:43 PM
Letter from Ben Zimmerman to Judge Victoria K. DeMarchi . (Zimmerman, Ben) |
|
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Response ( Non Motion )
Fri 11/30 11:48 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Ben Zimmerman. (Zimmerman, Ben) Modified on 11/30/2018 incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Tue 11/27 1:38 PM
Letter dated 11/24/2018 from Ben Zimmerman.(dhmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Received Document
Fri 11/16 11:07 AM
Copy of Letter from Deputy Clerk to Ben Zimmerman regarding Letter dated 11/7/2018 addressed to Chief District Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Tue 10/30 2:31 PM
Copy of Letter from Ben Zimmerman to Chief District Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton.(dhmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Fri 09/28 12:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ben Zimmerman re19 Opposition/Response to Motion,16 Complaint redacted (Zimmerman, Ben) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Mon 09/17 6:34 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE surreply to defendants' motion to dismiss filed byBen Zimmerman. (Zimmerman, Ben) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 09/17 2:44 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Mon 09/17 11:07 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/17/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/13 7:24 PM
COMPLAINT redacted against All Defendants. Filed byBen Zimmerman. (Zimmerman, Ben) |
|
15 | 15
audio
Auto docketing digital audio upload
Thu 09/13 11:25 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/12/2018 1:05:54 PM ]. File Size [ 9944 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:20:43 ]. (courtspeak) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/12 3:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 8 - held on 9/12/2018: Plaintiff to refile redacted complaint in accordance with FRCP 5.2, by 9/19/2018; Plaintiff to submit a supplemental brief in response to Defendants' reply by 9/26/2018; Court will take motion under submission. Case Management Conference reset for 10/31/2018 10:00 AM (parties may appear by phone); Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2018. Court provided contact information for Pro Se Help Desk Attorney, 408.297.1480, in room 2070 of courthouse. Plaintiff: Ben Zimmerman. Attorney for Defendants: Sharon Nagle. FTR Time: 1:05pm - 1:26pm. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2018) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Tue 08/14 1:51 PM
REPLY filed bySuperior Court of California County of Santa Clara, James Towery. (Nagle, Sharon) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing
Mon 08/13 10:45 AM
ORDER GRANTING Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing 10 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins.(lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Tue 08/07 9:54 AM
REPLY and OPPOSITION filed by Ben Zimmerman.(sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
10 | 10
motion
Permission for Electronic Case Filing
Tue 08/07 9:53 AM
MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Ben Zimmerman.(sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
oth_sup
Brief
Thu 07/26 1:19 PM
Brief re8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed bySuperior Court of California County of Santa Clara, James Towery. (Nagle, Sharon) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Thu 07/26 1:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara, James Towery. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 8/9/2018. Replies due by 8/16/2018.(Nagle, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/26 12:49 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara, James Towery.. (Nagle, Sharon) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/25 5:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ben Zimmerman. Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara served on 7/5/2018, answer due 7/26/2018; James Towery served on 7/5/2018, answer due 7/26/2018. (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/03 8:52 AM
NOTICE, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Ben Zimmerman (sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/03 8:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/03 8:49 AM
Summons Issued as to Judge James Towery. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 07/03 8:47 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/03 8:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara, James Towery (Filing fee $ 400. PAID). Filed by Ben Zimmerman.(sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt for payment |