Lopshire v. Maricopa, County of et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Raner C Collins |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00333 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 01, 2019 1:35 AM MST |
Defendant
Unknown Chen
|
|
Defendant
Stanford University
|
|
Defendant
Paul Tang
|
|
Defendant
Tucson City Council
|
|
Defendant
Keith Patrick Van Haren
|
|
Defendant
Louie Vega
|
|
Defendant
Joseph Wall
|
|
Defendant
Karen Friar
|
|
Defendant
Henry Greenly
|
|
Defendant
Kern, County of
|
|
Defendant
Maricopa, County of
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Parrish
|
|
Defendant
Pima County Board of Supervisors
|
|
Defendant
Pima County Sheriff's Department
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Defendant
Marla Richardson
|
|
Defendant
Arizona Board of Regents
|
|
Defendant
Joseph Arpaio
|
|
Defendant
Mark Brnovich
|
|
Defendant
Noelle Jensen
|
|
Defendant
Lucille Packard Children's Hospital
|
|
Defendant
James Marner
|
|
Defendant
Casey McGinley
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Navarro
|
|
Plaintiff
Caraleen Marie Lopshire
1913 N Rosemont Boulevard
Tucson, AZ 85715 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Van Haren Laboratory
Terminated: 07/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
Visions Research Group
Terminated: 07/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
Whitehead Institute Patent #
Terminated: 07/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
Steven Sparks
Terminated: 07/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
Cynthia Goldberg
Terminated: 07/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
Lisa Green
Terminated: 07/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
Carl Juno
Terminated: 07/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
Juno Therapeutics
Terminated: 07/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
Penn State
Terminated: 07/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
Pima County Board of Administrator
Terminated: 07/12/2018
|
|
Defendant
Pima County Jail
Terminated: 07/12/2018
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 02/11 4:54 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Caraleen Marie Lopshire. Reason for return: Unable to Forward. Document number 9, 10. (BAC) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Clerks Judgment
Wed 01/30 11:37 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed 1/30/19, judgment is entered against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing. The Amended Complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice. (BAC) |
|
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing
Wed 01/30 11:23 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's2 IFP Application is GRANTED. Plaintiff's3 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney is DENIED AS MOOT. The7 Amended Complaint in this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to close the Court's file in this case. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 1/29/19. (BAC) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/20 1:41 PM
ORDER: This Court has received unsolicited letters and documents from Plaintiff Caraleen Lopshire on July 18, 2018. No action will be taken on these documents. The letters and documents will be returned to Plaintiff and not filed on the Court docket. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/20/2018. (MMO) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 07/13 3:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arizona Board of Regents, Joseph Arpaio, Mark Brnovich, Unknown Chen, Karen Friar, Henry Greenly, Noelle Jensen, Kern, County of, Lucille Packard Children's Hospital, Maricopa, County of, James Marner, Casey McGinley, Unknown Navarro, Unknown Parrish, Pima County Board of Supervisors, Pima County Sheriff's Department, Marla Richardson, Stanford University, Paul Tang, Tucson City Council, Unknown Parties, Keith Patrick Van Haren, Louie Vega, Joseph Wall filed by Caraleen Marie Lopshire.(MFR) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice to Self-Represented Litigant
Fri 07/06 3:36 PM
NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAC) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
Fri 07/06 3:33 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 07/06 3:32 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Raner C Collins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-00333 TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Allow Electronic Filing
Fri 07/06 3:29 PM
MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney and Supporting Information by Caraleen Marie Lopshire. (BAC) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/06 3:24 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Caraleen Marie Lopshire. (BAC) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/06 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Caraleen Marie Lopshire.(BAC) |