6
|
|
6
notice
Notice of inquiry
Tue 07/31 2:19 PM
NOTICE of inquiry by Jemar Derrel Davis. (TMC)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
order
Judgment
Tue 07/24 9:03 AM
JUDGMENT that pursuant to this Court's Order, entered on July 23, 2018, Judgment is hereby entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/24/2018. (TMC)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
2
pgs
order
Order dismissing case
Mon 07/23 1:55 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 7/23/2018. (CAW)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
order
Related case order and track 1 notice
Wed 07/11 11:02 AM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/11/2018. (MD)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
order
Standing Order
Mon 07/09 4:47 PM
AMENDED STANDING ORDER to the Clerk to Notify Inspector General of the Florida Department of Corrections and Warden of Affected Institution Regarding Inmate Claim of Suicidal Intent or Other Imminent Physical Harm. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/11/2018.(TMC)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Petition for writ of habeas corpus
Mon 07/09 4:28 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus -State filed by Jemar Derrel Davis. (1 service copy received, no IFP, post marked 07/06/2018)(TMC)
Related: [-]
|