Ali Alikhani v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-05983 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 05, 2019 12:46 AM PST |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
1550 Peachtree St.
Atlanta, GA 30309 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ali Alikhani
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 01/10 11:12 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Ali Alikhani.(Loker, Matthew) |
|
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
minutes
Scheduling Conference - optional html form
Tue 12/18 8:44 AM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Held and Continued) before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) |
|
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Wed 11/28 10:56 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Ali Alikhani..(Loker, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Appearance
Fri 09/14 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bailey J Langner on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attorney Bailey J Langner added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Langner, Bailey) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 09/12 7:23 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 09/11 5:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Shortnacy, Michael) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/30 3:24 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Zachary A. McEntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, designating Michael B. Shortnacy as local counsel27 . (iv) |
|
29 | 29
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/30 3:21 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Misty L. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, designating Michael B. Shortnacy as local counsel26 . (iv) |
|
28 | 28
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/30 3:17 PM
ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Danielle Chattin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, designating Michael B. Shortnacy as local counsel25 . (iv) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 08/28 5:19 PM
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zachary A. McEntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/15/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22262477) filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Shortnacy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 08/28 5:13 PM
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Misty L. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/15/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22262354) filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Shortnacy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 08/28 4:51 PM
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Danielle Chattin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 8/27/2018, Receipt No. 097-22323851) filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Shortnacy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Tue 08/28 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected.21 22 Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) (lt) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Tue 08/28 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Danielle Chattin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22323851)20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Page 2 of the application is missing. (lt) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Amendment (Motion related)
Mon 08/27 4:57 PM
Amendment to APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Misty L. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22262354)16 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Shortnacy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
respm
Amendment (Motion related)
Mon 08/27 4:52 PM
Amendment to APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zachary A. McEntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22262477)17 filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Shortnacy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 08/27 4:40 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Danielle Chattin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22323851) filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Shortnacy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Thu 08/16 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zachary A. McEntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22262477)17 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Misty L. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22262354)16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt) |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/16 11:38 AM
ORDER DENIED EXTENDING DATE BY WHICH PLAINTIFF MUST FILE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION15 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (lom) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 08/15 4:53 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zachary A. McEntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22262477) filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Shortnacy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 08/15 4:46 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Misty L. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22262354) filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Shortnacy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 08/14 9:34 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Ali Alikhani.(Loker, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 08/10 5:36 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Equifax Information Services, LLC answer now due 9/11/2018, filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Shortnacy, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 08/10 5:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, identifying EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (Shortnacy, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Appearance
Fri 08/10 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Brian Shortnacy on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attorney Michael Brian Shortnacy added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Shortnacy, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 08/08 9:34 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ali Alikhani, upon Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/31/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, who is designated by law to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Wagner, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/23 10:59 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (yl) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Fri 07/20 11:24 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ali Alikhani. (Loker, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Thu 07/19 5:20 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request7 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (yl) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Summons Request
Wed 07/18 8:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Ali Alikhani. (Loker, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 07/11 8:00 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 07/10 3:17 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 07/10 3:17 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 07/09 11:32 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ali Alikhani, (Loker, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 07/09 11:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ali Alikhani. (Loker, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 07/09 11:29 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22061284 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ali Alikhani. (Attorney Matthew M Loker added to party Ali Alikhani(pty:pla))(Loker, Matthew) |