Hamilton v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Referred: | James L Cott |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-06225 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 06, 2019 3:40 AM EST |
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer OY
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 07/04 11:00 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (11 in 1:18-cv-06638-PAE-JLC, 11 in 1:18-cv-06631-PAE-JLC, 12 in 1:18-cv-06859-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-06269-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-06225-PAE-JLC, 17 in 1:18-cv-06732-PAE-JLC, 22 in 1:18-cv-06509-PAE-JLC, 12 in 1:18-cv-06862-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-06277-PAE-JLC, 12 in 1:18-cv-06856-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-06595-PAE-JLC, 17 in 1:18-cv-06852-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-06511-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-06592-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-06367-PAE-JLC, 16 in 1:18-cv-06382-PAE-JLC, 18 in 1:18-cv-06415-PAE-JLC, 17 in 1:18-cv-06364-PAE-JLC) Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer OY, Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG against Aimee Galloway, Aisha Cuffie, Aislynn Pounds, Angela Kolebuck Utz, Ashley Rodriguez, Bess Patterson, Brooke Birge, Erica Owens, Hannah Rutledge, Karrie Shields, Keri Rice, Kimberly Grant, Kimberly Hamilton, Laura Frisby, Shelby Luann McCain, Stacy Beth Swenton, Tammy Schatzberg, Tonina Bartles. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated June 11, 2019, Bayer's motion for summary judgment is granted and all remaining member cases in this MDL are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 6/21/2019)(rro) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal Package | ||
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
55
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 06/11 1:16 PM
OPINION & ORDER re: (328 in 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. For the reasons stated above, Bayer's motion for summary judgment is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion (No. 17 MD 2767, Dkt. 328), and to enter judgment in and close all remaining member cases in this MDL. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/11/2019) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
15 | 15
55
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 06/11 8:55 AM
OPINION & ORDER re: (328 in 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. For the reasons stated above, Bayer's motion for summary judgment is granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion (No. 17 MD 2767, Dkt. 328), and to enter judgment in and close all remaining member cases in this MDL. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/11/2019) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 03/15 2:57 PM
ORDER granting (343) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC; granting (134) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02674-PAE-JLC; granting (119) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02694-PAE-JLC; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02705-PAE-JLC; granting (82) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02715-PAE-JLC; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02718-PAE-JLC; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02737-PAE-JLC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02745-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02812-PAE-JLC; granting (73) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02813-PAE-JLC; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02814-PAE-JLC; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02816-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02819-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02821-PAE-JLC; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02826-PAE-JLC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02827-PAE-JLC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02861-PAE-JLC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02865-PAE-JLC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02866-PAE-JLC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02891-PAE-JLC; granting (131) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02900-PAE-JLC; granting (113) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02916-PAE-JLC; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02943-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02945-PAE-JLC; granting (137) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02947-PAE-JLC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02950-PAE-JLC; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02952-PAE-JLC; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02961-PAE-JLC; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02962-PAE-JLC; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02992-PAE-JLC; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02993-PAE-JLC; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-02994-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03067-PAE-JLC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03068-PAE-JLC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03069-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03072-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03074-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03080-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03083-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03084-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03085-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03087-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03088-PAE-JLC; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03124-PAE-JLC; granting (192) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03125-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03143-PAE-JLC; granting (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03146-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03147-PAE-JLC; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03216-PAE-JLC; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03219-PAE-JLC; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03231-PAE-JLC; granting (155) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03233-PAE-JLC; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03236-PAE-JLC; granting (99) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03238-PAE-JLC; granting (83) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03240-PAE-JLC; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03242-PAE-JLC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03298-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03334-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03335-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03354-PAE-JLC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03390-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03497-PAE-JLC; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-03499-PAE-JLC; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04301-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04579-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04581-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04582-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04583-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04584-PAE-JLC; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04597-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04967-PAE-JLC; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-04981-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05090-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05138-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05335-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05338-PAE-JLC; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05345-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05762-PAE-JLC; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-05763-PAE-JLC; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-06638-PAE-JLC; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-06714-PAE-JLC; granting (31) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07149-PAE-JLC; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07447-PAE-JLC; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07449-PAE-JLC; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-07877-PAE-JLC; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08399-PAE-JLC; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08479-PAE-JLC; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08487-PAE-JLC; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-08714-PAE-JLC; granting (22) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-09698-PAE-JLC; granting (20) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:17-cv-10241-PAE-JLC; granting (19) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-00349-PAE-JLC; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-02782-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-02885-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03784-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03796-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03847-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-03860-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04067-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04627-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04655-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04713-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04721-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04766-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04792-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04794-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04842-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-04976-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-05698-PAE-JLC; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-06415-PAE-JLC; granting (14) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-06732-PAE-JLC; granting (19) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-07330-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-07774-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08658-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08888-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08893-PAE-JLC; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08895-PAE-JLC; granting (17) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08899-PAE-JLC; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-08902-PAE-JLC; granting (12) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-09607-PAE-JLC; granting (11) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christina T. Natale terminated in case 1:18-cv-12373-PAE-JLC. It is hereby ORDERED that Ms. Natale's Motion is GRANTED and she is hereby terminated from these actions. The Clerk is notified to terminate Ms. Natale from all further notices in these actions. So entered this 15th day of March 2019. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/15/2019) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al. (anc) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 10/25 10:05 AM
ORDER: The Court directs counsel promptly to meet and confer as to next steps in this multi-district litigation. The Court asks counsel to consider whether, as in the earlier multi-district litigation involving Mirena presided over by Judge Seibel, this case should now proceed to motions for summary judgment limited to the issue of general causation. A joint letter, setting forth the parties' proposal(s) as to next steps, is due Friday, November 9, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/24/2018)***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) |
|
12 | 12
156
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 10/24 10:54 AM
OPINION & ORDER re: (134, 136, 138, 141, 143, 145, 147, 149, 151, 153, 155,158, 160, 162, 165, 168, 170, 172, and 175 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC) MOTIONS to exclude testimony filed by Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Bayer's motion to exclude the testimony of plaintiffs' seven general-causation witnesses, and denies, as potentially moot, plaintiffs' motions to exclude Bayer's 12 general-causation witnesses. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkts. 134, 136, 138, 141, 143, 145, 147, 149, 151, 153, 155, 158, 160, 162, 165, 168, 170, 172, and 175. An order as to next steps in this case will follow shortly. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/24/2018) **Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(anc) Modified on 10/24/2018 (anc) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/06 12:47 PM
MOTION for Robert J. Binstock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brianna Smith.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC et al.(Binstock, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Supreme Court of Texas- Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 4 Texas State Bar- Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/16 8:43 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Per chambers instructions) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 06/23/2017) (sjo) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Fri 07/13 11:05 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Fri 07/13 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 07/13 11:06 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (wb) |
||
utility
Case Consolidation - MDL
Mon 07/16 8:42 AM
CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC. (sjo) |
||
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/11 10:37 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer Pharma AG. (jgo) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/11 10:37 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer OY. (jgo) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/11 10:36 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (jgo) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Wed 07/11 9:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Trevor Bruce Rockstad. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 1 (Citizen of This State);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State);. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 07/11 9:15 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 07/11 9:17 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Wed 07/11 9:17 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 17-md-2767. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 07/10 10:27 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer OY, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Kimberly Hamilton. (Rockstad, Trevor) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 07/10 10:26 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer Pharma AG, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Kimberly Hamilton. (Rockstad, Trevor) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 07/10 10:26 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Kimberly Hamilton. (Rockstad, Trevor) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Tue 07/10 10:24 AM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-MD-2767. Document filed by Kimberly Hamilton.(Rockstad, Trevor) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 07/10 10:24 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rockstad, Trevor) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/10 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT against Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer OY, Bayer Pharma AG. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15302001)Document filed by Kimberly Hamilton.(Rockstad, Trevor) |