KLINE v. PFIZER INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Claire C Cecchi |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-11575 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Nov 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 08, 2019 4:10 AM EST |
Defendant
PFIZER INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WYETH LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES
|
Represented By
|
In Re
PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II)
|
|
Plaintiff
MARK KLINE
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD.
Terminated: 10/04/2018
|
|
Defendant
KREMERS URBAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Terminated: 11/13/2018
|
|
Defendant
SANDOZ INC.
Terminated: 10/11/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/29 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BETH S. ROSE on behalf of TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED (ROSE, BETH) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Thu 01/05 9:40 AM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JEFFREY R. LILLY terminated. Attorney BETH S. ROSE for ABBOTT LABORATORIES,BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC.,BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED,BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.,BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. added.. (ROSE, BETH) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
misc
QC - Generic Message
Wed 10/12 11:34 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The NOTICE of Appearance by JASON SCOTT GOLDSTEIN (DE#24) and The MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (DE#25) were submitted incorrectly, they should have been filed as a Substitution of Attorney. The correction has already been made, no further action necessary. (jl, ) |
||
Tuesday, October 11, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 10/11 1:53 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MARK KLINE, PATRICIA MARIE KLINE. (DURANT, CHRISTINE) |
|
Monday, October 10, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/10 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JASON SCOTT GOLDSTEIN on behalf of MARK KLINE, PATRICIA MARIE KLINE (GOLDSTEIN, JASON) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 06/22 9:19 AM
STIPULATION and TEXT ORDER of DISMISSAL as to NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY. (THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY terminated). Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 6/22/2022. (krg, ) |
||
Monday, June 20, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty)
Mon 06/20 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MARK KLINE (DURANT, CHRISTINE) |
|
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
19
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/22 7:01 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiffs enumerated on the attached Exhibit A are hereby ordered to show cause within thirty (30) days as follows (1) establish that service was effected on the identified P&G and PGM defendants as required by Rule 4(m) by filing proof of service, (2) voluntarily dismiss the identified P&G and PGM defendants, or (3) show cause why the identified P&G and PGM defendants should not be dismissed. (Special Master Order). Signed by Ellen Reisman, Special Master on 11/19/2021. (jl, ) |
|
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 10/22 1:29 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to the case. (mxw, ) |
||
Thursday, March 12, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 03/12 4:08 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney MICHAEL S. WERNER terminated. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/12/2020. (jl, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/06 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN A. KLEIN on behalf of NOVARTIS INSTITUTES FOR BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, INC., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION (KLEIN, STEPHEN) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/30 9:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY R. LILLY on behalf of TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (LILLY, JEFFREY) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/30 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY R. LILLY on behalf of ABBOTT LABORATORIES (LILLY, JEFFREY) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/26 4:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY on behalf of MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION (HINDY, GREGORY) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 07/16 12:14 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MARK KLINE, PATRICIA MARIE KLINE. (DURANT, CHRISTINE) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/15 3:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint/Without Prejudice by GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) LLC, NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH, INC.. (MCCONNELL, STEPHEN) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/15 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE M. DURANT on behalf of MARK KLINE, PATRICIA MARIE KLINE (DURANT, CHRISTINE) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/17 11:16 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) LLC, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH, INC., NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVARTIS INSTITUTES FOR BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, INC., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC., PFIZER INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC. F/K/A TAP HOLDINGS INC., THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jl, ) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/08 4:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against PFIZER INC., WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES, ABBOTT LABORATORIES, GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) LLC, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC., NOVARTIS INSTITUTES FOR BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, INC., NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH, INC., THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC. F/K/A TAP HOLDINGS INC., filed by MARK KLINE, PATRICIA MARIE KLINE.(WERNER, MICHAEL) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 11/13 1:42 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/13/18. (jl, ) |
|
misc
QC - Generic Message
Tue 11/13 1:48 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Case closed in error has been reopened. (gh, ) |
||
Monday, November 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 11/12 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MARK KLINE (WERNER, MICHAEL) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 10/11 1:52 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of DISMISSAL as to NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/11/18. (jl, ) |
|
8 | 8
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 10/11 8:41 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of DISMISSAL as to NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/11/18. (jl, ) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 10/05 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MARK KLINE (WERNER, MICHAEL) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 10/04 10:58 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.; Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(I) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Mark Kline voluntary dismisses Defendant Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., from this matter without prejudice, each party to bear its own cost and expenses. The case shall remain pending against the other defendants. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/03/2018. (sms) |
|
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 10/03 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MARK KLINE (WERNER, MICHAEL) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Tue 09/25 2:46 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Sandoz Inc.. Attorney AARON VAN NOSTRAND for SANDOZ INC. added. (VAN NOSTRAND, AARON) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Tue 09/25 4:44 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SANDOZ INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/09/2018. (sms) |
||
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/11 10:40 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by PFIZER INC., WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES.(BROWN, LOREN) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/16 3:32 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD., KREMERS URBAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PFIZER INC., SANDOZ INC., WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Gail A. Hansen* (gh, ) |
|
order
Case Management Order
Mon 07/16 3:33 PM
For all Case Management Orders[LINK:click here] (gh, ) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Mon 07/16 3:35 PM
Member Case Direct File on 7/12/18, for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II) (gh, ) |
||
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/12 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT against DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD., KREMERS URBAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PFIZER INC., SANDOZ INC., WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8878675) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARK KLINE.(WERNER, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Kremers Urban Pharmaceuticals Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Pfizer, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Sandoz Inc., | ||
Att: 6 Summons Wyeth LLC, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 07/13 11:26 AM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (gh, ) |