New York Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah Netburn
Case #: 1:18-cv-06380
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2018
Terminated:May 07, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 09, 2019 4:06 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Atari Gamebox LLC
Represented By
Michael R. Gaico
Bressler, Amery & Ross, Pc (nyc)
contact info
Denver George Edwards
Bressler, Amery & Ross, Pc (nyc)
contact info
Counter Defendant
Feargal Mac Conuladh
Represented By
Richard J. Mooney
Rimon, P.C.
contact info
Scott Robert Raber
Rimon, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Atari Gamebox LLC
475 Park Avenue South
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Michael R. Gaico
Bressler, Amery & Ross, Pc (nyc)
contact info
Denver George Edwards
Bressler, Amery & Ross, Pc (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Feargal Mac Conuladh
Represented By
Richard J. Mooney
Rimon, P.C.
contact info
Scott Robert Raber
Rimon, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, May 24, 2019
40 40 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/24 12:24 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .(Mooney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
39 39 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 05/07 12:29 PM
ORDER: On May 6, 2019, the parties appeared before the Court for a settlement conference, during which they reached an agreement in principle. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice provided, however, that within 30 days of the date of this Order, counsel for the parties may apply by letter to restore this action to this Court's calendar, in which event the action will be restored. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 05/07/2019) (ras)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
38 38 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 04/16 5:19 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Richard J. Mooney on behalf of Feargal Mac Conuladh. New Address: RJM Litigation Group, 505 Montgomery St. #1100, San Francisco, California, USA 94111, 4153073021. (Mooney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
37 37 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/08 4:00 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's summary judgment motion is due Friday, May 17, 2019. Defendant's opposition is due Monday, June 17, 2019. Plaintiff's reply is due Monday, July 1, 2019. A settlement conference is scheduled for Monday, May 6, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Motions due by 5/17/2019. Responses due by 6/17/2019. Replies due by 7/1/2019. Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 04/08/2019) (ras)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 05/01 12:42 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Telephone Conference held on 4/5/2019. (ras)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
36 36 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/03 5:47 PM
ORDER: The parties have filed a joint letter discussing anticipated summary judgment motions and the parties conflicting views about the value of a settlement conference. Accordingly, a telephone conference is scheduled for Friday, April 5, 2019, at 12:15 P.M. to discuss the content of this letter. At that time, the parties should jointly call Chambers, at (212) 805-0286, with all relevant individuals on the line. If this date is unavailable for any party, they must contact Courtroom Deputy Rachel Slusher immediately at (212) 805-0286. (Telephone Conference set for 4/5/2019 at 12:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 04/03/2019) (ras)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
35 35 misc Letter Mon 04/01 5:35 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Richard Mooney dated 04/01/2019 re: Joint Report re Summary Judgment and Settlement Conference. Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh.(Mooney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
34 34 order Order on Motion for Discovery Mon 03/11 9:34 AM
ORDER granting33 Letter Motion for Discovery. A telephone conference is scheduled for Monday, March 11, 2019 at 4:30 pm. At that time, the parties should jointly call Chambers at (212) 805-0286, with all relevant individuals on the line. If this date is unavailable for any party, they must contact Courtroom Deputy Rachel Slusher immediately at (212) 805-0286. The purpose of the conference is to discuss Defendant's objections to four deposition notices sent by Plaintiff. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 03/11 9:35 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (ras)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
33 33 motion Discovery Fri 03/08 5:10 PM
LETTER MOTION for Discovery To Limit Depositions addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Denver Edwards, Esq. dated 3/8/2019. Document filed by Atari Gamebox LLC.(Edwards, Denver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 02/12 6:49 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery shall close on April 9, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. By April 1, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status letter discussing any anticipated summary judgment motions and a proposed briefing schedule, and indicating whether the parties request a settlement conference with another magistrate judge or referral to the Court's Mediation Program. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/11 11:56 AM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiff dated 02/11/2019 re:30 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Denver G. Edwards dated February 8, 2019. . Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh. (Mooney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
30 30 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 02/08 4:55 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Denver G. Edwards dated February 8, 2019. Document filed by Atari Gamebox LLC.(Edwards, Denver)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
29 29 order Protective Order Thu 02/07 5:39 PM
STIPULATION OF CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...Prior application to file under seal is required. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 02/07/2019) (ras)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
28 28 misc Proposed Protective Order Wed 02/06 1:35 PM
PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Atari Gamebox LLC. (Edwards, Denver)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/29 1:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Denver George Edwards on behalf of Atari Gamebox LLC. (Edwards, Denver)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 18, 2019
26 26 misc Letter Fri 01/18 6:29 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Richard Mooney dated 01/18/2019 re: Joint Report re Status of Discovery. Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh.(Mooney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 14, 2019
25 25 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/14 3:49 PM
ORDER: On November 8, 2018, the Court ordered the parties to file a "letter informing the Court about the status of discovery" no later than January 11, 2019. ECF No. 24. The parties have not done so. Accordingly, they are ORDERED to file a joint status report regarding the status of discovery and any outstanding discovery disputes no later than January 18, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 01/14/2019) (ras)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2018
24 24 order Case Management Plan Fri 11/09 11:29 AM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN & SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties may amend the pleadings or join additional parties until Friday, December 14, 2018. All fact discovery shall be completed by Friday, February 8, 2019. The parties request a jury trial. (Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 12/14/2018. Fact Discovery due by 2/8/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/8/2018) (ras)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 11/19 12:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/8/2018. (ras)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
23 23 order Memo Endorsement Tue 11/06 6:22 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:22 Letter filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the request of Plaintiff's counsel to appear by telephone, the Court will hold the entire conference by telephone at 2:00 P.M. on November 8, 2018. At that time, the parties should jointly call Chambers, at (212) 805-0286, with all relevant individuals on the line. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/6/2018) (ras)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 05, 2018
22 22 misc Letter Mon 11/05 5:11 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiff's Counsel dated 11/05/2018 re: Unupposed Request for Telephonic Appearance. Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh.(Mooney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
21 21 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 09/28 11:15 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:20 Letter filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. The Initial Pretrial Conference is ADJOURNED to Thursday, November 8, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. The deadline to file the proposed civil case management plan is extended to Thursday, November 1, 2018. (Initial Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/28/2018) (ras)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 27, 2018
20 20 misc Letter Thu 09/27 9:13 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Richard Mooney dated 09/27/2018 re: Unopposed Request for Adjournment of IPTC. Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh.(Mooney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 20, 2018
19 19 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 09/20 11:31 AM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference pursuant to Rule 16 is scheduled for Thursday, October 4, 2018, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Initial Conference set for 10/4/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/20/2018) (ras)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
18 18 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/18 11:37 AM
CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Atari Gamebox LLC, Feargal Mac Conuladh. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/18/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
17 17 1 pgs order Order Tue 09/11 5:37 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 17, 2018, is ADJOURNED sine die. After the matter has been referred, the parties shall contact Judge Netburn to arrange an initial pretrial conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/11/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 10, 2018
16 16 misc Letter Mon 09/10 9:19 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Richard Mooney dated 09/10/2018 re: Basis for Diversity Jurisdiction. Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh.(Mooney, Richard)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Mon 09/10 8:51 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Richard Mooney dated 09/10/2018 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh.(Mooney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
14 14 respoth Reply (non-motion) Tue 08/28 8:39 PM
REPLY re:10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim . Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh. (Mooney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 11, 2018
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 08/11 5:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard J. Mooney on behalf of Feargal Mac Conuladh. (Mooney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/07 4:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael R. Gaico on behalf of Atari Gamebox LLC. (Gaico, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/07 1:02 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Richard James Mooney to Appear Pro Hac Vice: GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (Torres, Analisa)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 08/07 12:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Atari Gamebox LLC.(Edwards, Denver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Withdrawal from project
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/07 12:26 PM
MOTION for Richard James Mooney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh.(Mooney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit OF RICHARD J. MOONEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Affidavit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order RE ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 08/07 12:34 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 9 MOTION for Richard James Mooney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 06, 2018
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/06 1:05 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Richard James Mooney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15411185. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh.(Mooney, Richard) Modified on 8/6/2018 (jc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit OF RICHARD J. MOONEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order RE ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/06 1:22 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 8 MOTION for Richard James Mooney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15411185. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit is missing some of the language required by Local Rule 1.3, i.e. whether the applicant has ever been convicted of a felony AND whether the applicant has ever been censured, suspended, disbarred or denied admission or readmission by any court. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
7 7 service Certificate of Service Complaints Wed 07/25 4:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Atari Gamebox LLC served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Agent for Service. Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh. (Raber, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
6 6 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 07/16 3:39 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/16/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Mon 07/16 3:37 PM
ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/16/2018) (cf)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 07/16 2:55 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Atari Gamebox LLC. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 07/16 11:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Robert Raber. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $977000000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $977000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 07/16 11:35 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 07/16 11:35 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 07/16 11:35 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 13, 2018
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 07/13 6:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Raber, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 07/13 5:53 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Atari Gamebox LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh. (Raber, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/13 4:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Atari Gamebox LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15321443)Document filed by Feargal Mac Conuladh.(Raber, Scott)
Related: [-]