ITSERVE Alliance Inc v. Nielsen et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01823 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 10, 2019 2:45 AM CST |
Defendant
Kirstjen Nielsen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
US Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ITSERVE Alliance Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Wed 03/06 1:44 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE - Before the Court is the Parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, filed on March 6, 2019 (Doc. No. 34). In light of the Parties Stipulation, this case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each Party shall bear its own costs, fees and attorney's fees. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/6/2019) (chmb) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation
Wed 03/06 12:11 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Kirstjen Nielsen, US Department of Homeland Security. (Go, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Mon 02/25 2:44 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting32 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Objections to F&R due by March 5, 2019. If the Defendant chooses to file a Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Findings and Recommendations, then it shall be filed no later than March 12, 2019. There shall be no extensions of this Deadline. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/25/2019) (chmb) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 02/25 2:25 PM
MOTION to Extend Time To respond to Magistrate's recommendation filed by ITSERVE Alliance Inc (Akula, Kavitha) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Mon 02/11 4:59 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE:The Court should GRANT Defendants' Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) (ECF No.22 ) and DISMISS Plaintiff's claims against Defendants without prejudice. Further, because the Court lacks jurisdiction to hear this case, the Court should DENY Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No.5 ). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/11/2019) (axm) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
4
pgs
order
Order
Mon 01/28 10:28 AM
ORDER GRANTING GOVERNMENT'S OMNIBUS MOTION FOR LIFT OF STAY: Unless otherwise directed by the United States District Judge presiding in a particular case, all deadlines that had not expired on or before December 21, 2018 in a case covered by the stay order are extended for 34 days (i.e., the duration of the lapse in appropriations for the Department of Justice). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/26/2019) (ctf) (ctf) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Omnibus Motion to Lift Stay | ||
Att: 1 (1/28/2019) Additional Page(s) | ||
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel - AUSA - AFPD
Fri 01/04 11:00 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ added as AUSA. (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 12/28 12:55 PM
Order Granting Government's Omnibus Motion for Stay of Cases in Light of Lapse of Appropriations (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 12/28/2018) (lrl) |
|
Att: 1 Government's Omnibus Motion for Stay | ||
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
12
pgs
respm
Reply
Tue 10/30 6:42 PM
REPLY filed by Kirstjen Nielsen, US Department of Homeland Security re:22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Go, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A | ||
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 10/16 12:37 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by ITSERVE Alliance Inc re:22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Wasden, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order Referring Motion
Mon 10/15 2:36 PM
ELECTRONIC Order Referring Motion re:22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/15/2018) (chmb) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/28 10:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kirstjen Nielsen, US Department of Homeland Security. (Go, Samuel) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 09/28 10:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kirstjen Nielsen, US Department of Homeland Security with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Go, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order Referring Motion
Wed 09/12 3:56 PM
ELECTRONIC Order Referring Motion re:5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/12/2018) (chmb) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply
Fri 08/31 9:52 PM
REPLY filed by ITSERVE Alliance Inc re:5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Wasden, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix | ||
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/28 4:57 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Wasden. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/28/2018) (chmb) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/27 10:19 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9409796) filed by ITSERVE Alliance Inc (Wasden, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Supporting Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/23 4:25 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying without prejudice to re-file15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Wasden. Movant shall refile his Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice using the required form found on this Courts' website. Clerk shall return admission fee to Applicant. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/23/2018) (chmb) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/21 4:58 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel must file a courtesy copy of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction and supporting brief and appendix within two (2) days of the date of this Order, otherwise the Court will unfile these documents without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/21/2018) (aaa) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/21 7:38 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9397336) filed by ITSERVE Alliance IncAttorney Jonathan Wasden added to party ITSERVE Alliance Inc(pty:pla) (Wasden, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Sunday, August 19, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response/Objection
Sun 08/19 7:42 AM
RESPONSE filed by Kirstjen Nielsen, US Department of Homeland Security re:5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Go, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A | ||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/06 2:12 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 8/20/2018. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/6/2018) (chmb) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/03 9:39 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kirstjen Nielsen, US Department of Homeland Security (Go, Samuel) Enhanced text to include unopposed on 8/3/2018 (dsr) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
sealex
Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document
Fri 08/03 8:53 AM
(Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Kirstjen Nielsen, US Department of Homeland Security (Woodward-DOJ, Amber) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 08/03 8:47 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amber Woodward-DOJ on behalf of Kirstjen Nielsen, US Department of Homeland Security. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Woodward-DOJ, Amber) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 08/02 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel P Go on behalf of Kirstjen Nielsen, US Department of Homeland Security. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Go, Samuel) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Fri 07/27 1:54 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by ITSERVE Alliance Inc re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Akula, Kavitha) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Wed 07/25 4:47 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by ITSERVE Alliance Inc re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Akula, Kavitha) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
5 | 5
motion
Injunction
Wed 07/25 4:43 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ITSERVE Alliance Inc (Akula, Kavitha). Modified on 7/25/2018 per atty Akula. (chmb) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Conference | ||
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/16 8:29 AM
Summons issued as to Kirstjen Nielsen, US Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (zkc) |
|
Saturday, July 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Kinkeade
Mon 07/16 8:28 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Sat 07/14 1:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ITSERVE ALLIANCE, INC.. (Akula, Kavitha) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Sat 07/14 1:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Kirstjen Nielsen filed by ITSERVE ALLIANCE, INC.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9316275) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Akula, Kavitha) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) |