Asig-Putul v. HEARTLAND HUMAN CARE SERVICES, INC.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kathleen M Williams |
Referred: | Edwin G Torres |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-22855 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 12, 2019 4:02 AM EST |
Defendant
HEARTLAND HUMAN CARE SERVICES, INC.,
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Otilia Asig-Putul
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 10/09 9:44 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, as this case has already been dismissed and closed. See 10 . Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/9/2018. (eft) |
|
Monday, October 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
16
pgs
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 10/08 9:14 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint,, by HEARTLAND HUMAN CARE SERVICES, INC.,. Attorney Gregory Scott Glasser added to party HEARTLAND HUMAN CARE SERVICES, INC.,(pty:dft). Responses due by 10/22/2018(Glasser, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Exh A | ||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 09/26 2:01 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Closing Case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/25/2018. See attached document for full details. (vmz) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Tue 09/25 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Defendant Heartland Alliance by Otilia Asig-Putul (LePierre, Dallas) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 09/17 4:49 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Otilia Asig-Putul. HEARTLAND HUMAN CARE SERVICES, INC., served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (LePierre, Dallas) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/17 4:44 PM
NOTICE by Otilia Asig-Putul re1 Complaint,,4 Summons Issued Report on Status of Service on Defendant (LePierre, Dallas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Thu 09/13 10:29 AM
ORDER: On or before September 19, 2018, Plaintiff shall file a report detailing all efforts made to date to effectuate service of process on the Defendant. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/12/2018. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/16 4:51 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions are REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall adhere to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, Judge Williams' Court Practices and Procedures, and Judge Torres' Standing Order Setting Discovery Procedures. Judge Williams' Court Practices and Procedures and Judge Torres' Standing Order Setting Discovery Procedures are available at the Court's website:[LINK:http://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/content/judge-kathleen-m-williams] . Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/16/2018. (eft) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/16 2:56 PM
Summons Issued as to HEARTLAND HUMAN CARE SERVICES, INC. (pes) |
|
3 | 3
order
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Mon 07/16 2:12 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case.Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pes) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 07/16 2:12 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/16 12:40 PM
COMPLAINT against HEARTLAND HUMAN CARE SERVICES, INC. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-10818135, payment transferred from : 1:18-cv-22849 Otilia Asig-Putul, On behalf of her minor son W.A. v. Heartland Human Care Services, Inc., John Doe #1, John Doe #2, and John Doe #3, filed by Otilia Asig-Putul.(LePierre, Dallas) Modified text on 7/16/2018 to reflect correct transferred from case and Complaint against Defendant (bb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |