TREVINO v. JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Lois H Goodman |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-11996 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 19, 2019 3:26 AM EST |
Defendant
JANSSEN ORTHO LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
In Re
INVOKANA (CANAGLIFLOZIN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
ARTHUR TREVINO, JR
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 04/23 10:25 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/23/2019. (mmh) |
|
mdl
MDL Closed
Tue 04/23 10:26 AM
Member Case Closed on 4/23/2019 for MDL 2750. (mmh) |
||
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/17 6:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY.(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/24 12:55 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kas, ) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 07/24 10:18 AM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (kas, ) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Tue 07/24 12:55 PM
Member Case Direct File on 7/23/2018, for MDL 16-2750 Party INVOKANA (CANAGLIFLOZIN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (kas, ) |
||
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/23 11:20 PM
COMPLAINT against JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8903135) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ARTHUR TREVINO, JR.(CURTIS, WILLIAM) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |