Eastwood et al v. Molecular Defenses Corporation et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John G Koeltl |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-06652 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:256 Patent Non-Infringement (Correction of Named Inventor) |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 20, 2019 4:26 AM EST |
Defendant
Kevin Davis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Molecular Defense Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Molecular Defenses Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Molecular Defenses Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thyogen Group Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Bernstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clinton Eastwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Does 1 through XXXX
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
62 | 62
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 05/01 4:54 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:61 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Molecular Defense Holdings LLC, Molecular Defenses Corporation, Molecular Defenses Group, Inc., Thyogen Group Corporation, Kevin Davis against Clinton Eastwood, Howard Bernstein. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated May 1, 2019, the defendants' motion to dismiss the plaintiffs' complaint is granted and the plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 5/1/2019)(km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal | ||
61 | 61
17
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 05/01 2:37 PM
OPINION AND ORDER re:43 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Molecular Defense Holdings LLC, Kevin Davis, Molecular Defenses Group, Inc., Molecular Defenses Corporation, Thyogen Group Corporation. The defendants' motion to dismiss the plaintiffs' complaint is granted and the plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. The Clerk of Court is directed to close all open motions on the docket and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/1/19) (yv) |
|
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Wed 05/01 4:56 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km) |