KARL v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Shipp |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-12083 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 22, 2019 3:22 AM EST |
Defendant
IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC")
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER , INC.
|
Represented By
|
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
JAMIE KARL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, January 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case
Thu 01/11 3:55 PM
Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney TRENT B. MIRACLE terminated. (MIRACLE, TRENT) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2023 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 02/21 2:32 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman and Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. (jal, ) |
||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/22 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC") (SILVER, MARK) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/02 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/02 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/01 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (TERSIGNI, JULIE) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/31 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/26 3:43 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ces) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/26 11:59 AM
COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8910400) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ESTATE OF CONNIE COX-LAFRAMBOISE.(MIRACLE, TRENT) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/26 3:21 PM
Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (ces) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Thu 07/26 3:44 PM
Member Case Direct File on 7/26/2018, for MDL 16-2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (ces) |