SpeakWare, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:18-cv-01293 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 22, 2019 12:17 AM PST |
Defendant
Microsoft Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SpeakWare, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago |
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
97 | 97
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Tue 07/30 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)95 . Inadvertently, the order did not get attached with the AO 120 form. See docket entry 96 for corrected report. (lom) |
|
96 | 96
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Tue 07/30 4:16 PM
CORRECTED REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lom) Modified on 7/30/2019 (lom) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
95 | 95
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Tue 07/30 4:14 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lom) |
|
94 | 94
order
Dismiss Party
Tue 07/30 4:05 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL93 by Judge David O. Carter. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims for relief against Amazon are dismissed with prejudice and Amazon's claims, defenses and/or counterclaims for relief against Plaintiff are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (lom) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2019 | ||
93 | 93
motion
Dismiss Party
Mon 07/29 2:49 PM
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Amazon.com Inc filed by Plaintiff SpeakWare, Inc.. (Franzini, Simon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
92 | 92
order
Dismiss Party
Mon 07/29 1:03 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting91 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google LLC. Terminating Google LLC (a Delaware corporation). (twdb) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2019 | ||
91 | 91
motion
Dismiss Party
Fri 07/26 5:30 PM
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Google LLC filed by Plaintiff SpeakWare, Inc.. (Franzini, Simon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
90 | 90
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/23 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Order and Report of Special Master regarding the protective order filed by Plaintiff SpeakWare, Inc..(Franzini, Simon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |