Hrepsime Lopez v. C. R. Bard, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:18-cv-01295 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 22, 2019 12:33 AM PST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C. R. Bard, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hrepsime Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 11/14 4:30 PM
ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE by Judge David O. Carter45 . (twdb) |
|
45 | 45
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 11/13 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Hrepsime Lopez.(Becklin, Brittany) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE | ||
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Fri 11/08 3:16 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))42 by Judge David O. Carter. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 11/15/19. Please review the Notice of Deficiencies43 and refile by 11/15/19 and also submit a proposed order dismissing the case. (twdb) |
|
43 | 43
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 11/08 9:09 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))42 . The following error(s) was/were found: The proof of service on page 2 not signed In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 11/07 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Hrepsime Lopez. Dismissal is without. (Becklin, Brittany) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
order
Dismissing Case
Mon 08/19 8:38 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE: The Court, having been notified by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled re Notice of Settlement40 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for thirty (30) days to vacate this order and reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been consummated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Settlement
Fri 08/16 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Morrison, Haley) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 08/13 2:41 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Final Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for 8/26/2019 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 05/20 12:12 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Reschedule Final Pretrial Conference37 . Final Pretrial Conference continued to 8/26/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (twdb) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
stip
Reschedule
Fri 05/17 1:47 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Final Pretrial Conference filed by Plaintiff Hrepsime Lopez.(Becklin, Brittany) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Reschedule Final Pretrial Conference | ||
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 05/10 3:41 PM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Continue Pretrial and Trial Deadlines35 . Motions due by 8/5/2019., Final Pretrial Conference continued to 9/9/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter., Jury Trial continued to 10/1/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
stip
Continue
Wed 05/08 3:59 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Deadlines filed by Plaintiff Hrepsime Lopez.(Becklin, Brittany) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Continue Pretrial and Trial Deadlines | ||
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 04/22 1:26 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Denying Stipulated for Protective Order32 by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The Proposed Protective Order (Dkt. 32) is DENIED without prejudice. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 04/19 9:21 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Protective Order32 . The following error(s) was/were found: 1. All filings pertaining to discovery, including proposed protective orders, shall include the following in the caption: [Discovery Document: Referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early]. 2. See Magistrate Judge John D. Early's Procedures and Schedules page (located on the court's website) at No. 12 for further instruction. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
stip
Protective Order
Fri 04/12 2:06 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc..(Morrison, Haley) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
order
Relief
Fri 03/29 8:25 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: Granting29 MOTION for Relief from Scheduling Order. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion, and ORDERS that Defendants treat written discovery propounded on March 25, 2019 as valid and respond to such discovery by May 3, 2019. The Court excuses Plaintiff from the Courts Scheduling Order regarding the deadline for service of written discovery solely for the purpose that the written discovery Plaintiff served on Defendant on March 25, 2019 is now valid and timely. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 03/28 8:57 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief 29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. The first 2 pages of the motion are incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Relief
Wed 03/27 6:59 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Scheduling Order re Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,26 filed by Plaintiff Hrepsime Lopez. (Becklin, Brittany) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order RE Relief From Order Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 60(B)(1) | ||
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Tue 01/22 9:10 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc... (Morrison, Haley) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Tue 11/20 3:53 PM
AMENDED ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge David O. Carter. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than January 28, 2019. (dgo) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Mon 10/29 12:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER & ORDER RE: PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES by Judge David O. Carter: Discovery cut-off 5/3/2019, Motion cut-off 6/24/2019 @ 8:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter, Jury Trial set for 8/20/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Mon 10/29 12:19 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge David O. Carter. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than January 28, 2019. (dgo) |
|
24 | 24
minutes
Scheduling Conference - optional html form
Mon 10/29 12:18 PM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Scheduling Order to be issued. Court Reporter: CourtSmart; Courtroom Deputy: Deborah Lewman; Plaintiff Attorney: Lorenza Herrera; Defendant Attorney: Haley M. Morrison; Time in Court: :03. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/26 10:57 AM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting21 Non-Resident Attorney Megan R. Reuther APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Defendant, designating Benjamin M. Gipson as local counsel. (twdb) |
|
22 | 22
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Fri 10/26 10:30 AM
Text Only Order STRIKING APPLICATION to Certify Certificate of Good Standing of Megan R. Reuther17 , APPLICATION for Order for (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice Megan R. Reuther 18 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan R. Reuther to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc., Does (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22626945)16 for the reasons noted in the Notices of Deficiency18 ,19 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) |
|
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 10/25 11:20 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan R. Reuther to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 10/23/2018, Receipt No. 26D2IUVL) filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Attorney Benjamin M Gipson added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin M Gipson added to party C. R. Bard, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Gipson, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 10/24 3:46 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION to Certify Certificate of Good Standing of Megan R. Reuther17 , APPLICATION for Order for (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice Megan R. Reuther 18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Both of these are to be attached as separate documents to PHV application, not filed separately as separate documents. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lt) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Wed 10/24 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan R. Reuther to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc., Does (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22626945)16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Good standing Certificate and Proposed Order should be as attachment to Application and not docketed as a separate documents (lt) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
motion
Order
Tue 10/23 2:45 PM
APPLICATION for Order for (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice Megan R. Reuther filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc., Does. (Dollarhide, Mary) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Certify
Tue 10/23 2:42 PM
APPLICATION to Certify Certificate of Good Standing of Megan R. Reuther filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc., Does. (Dollarhide, Mary) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 10/23 2:39 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan R. Reuther to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc., Does (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22626945) filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc., Does. (Attorney Mary C Dollarhide added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mary C Dollarhide added to party C. R. Bard, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mary C Dollarhide added to party Does(pty:dft)) (Dollarhide, Mary) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 10/22 3:09 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lorenzo Herrera counsel for Plaintiff Hrepsime Lopez. Adding Larry Herrera as counsel of record for Hrepsime Lopez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Hrepsime Lopez. (Attorney Lorenzo Herrera added to party Hrepsime Lopez(pty:pla))(twdb) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 10/16 9:00 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 10/22/2018 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2018 @ 7:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 10/12 10:39 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Defendant C. R. Bard, Inc... (Morrison, Haley) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extension of Time to File
Fri 10/05 9:38 AM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting11 Joint Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Rule 26(f) Report. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline to file the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) report is moved from October 5, 2018 to October 12, 2018. (twdb) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 10/04 9:29 AM
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed by Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Morrison, Haley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 07/27 2:06 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2018 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 07/27 2:05 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) |
|
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 07/27 12:23 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc., of Notice of Removal to Superior Court and Notice of Removal to Adverse Party served on 07/26/2017. (Morrison, Haley) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 07/26 2:25 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 07/26 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 07/26 1:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Morrison, Haley) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 07/26 1:33 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Becton, Dickinson and Company. (Morrison, Haley) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/26 1:27 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. identifying Becton, Dickinson and Company as Corporate Parent. (Morrison, Haley) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 07/26 1:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018 01001473 Receipt No: 0973-22154139 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Attorney Haley M Morrison added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Haley M Morrison added to party C. R. Bard, Inc.(pty:dft))(Morrison, Haley) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Haley Morrison, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Gary DeFazio | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 07/26 2:08 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc., Does 1-50, inclusive. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Hrepsime Lopez. Filed in State Court on 6/25/18 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 07/26 2:10 PM
UNCONFORMED COPY ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal1 .(car) |