Moore v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Landya B Mccafferty |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00663 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 23, 2019 3:56 AM EST |
Defendant
Atrium Medical Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Getinge AB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erick Moore
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 01/16 3:55 PM
///STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Getinge AB Only by Erick Moore(Schulte, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Attorney Withdrawal
Wed 08/14 1:07 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Enjolique D. Aytch on behalf of All Defendants(Aytch, Enjolique) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extend Time
Thu 04/18 3:10 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Deadlines in CMO 3H filed by All Plaintiffs. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al. Follow up on Objection on 5/2/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Hilliard, Russell) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wed 05/22 4:04 PM
Document 1095 in 16-md-2753-LM terminated as was incorrectly spread by parties. See Document 1096 in 16-md-2753-LM. (de) |
||
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 01/10 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs.(Orent, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extend Time
Fri 11/16 12:16 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to the Deadline to File a Reply in Support of Getinge ABs Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Getinge AB. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Aytch, Enjolique) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Addendum
Thu 10/18 12:37 PM
Addendum/ to (1006 in 1:16-md-02753-LM) Notice (Other), Exhibit 1 - Plainitffs' Re-Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition by All Plaintiffs.(Schiavone, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 2 Hjalmarson Deposition Transcript Portions, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 3 Hjalmarson Privilege Log, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 4 Hjalmarson Errata Sheet - Redacted | ||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 09/26 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David R Grasher on behalf of Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Getinge USA, Inc., Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Maquet Cardiovascular, LLC Attorney David R Grasher added to party Atrium Medical Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Atrium Medical Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge AB(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge AB(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Getinge USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David R Grasher added to party Maquet Cardiovascular, LLC(pty:dft).(Grasher, David) |
|
notice
Hearing Notice
Wed 09/26 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Status Conference set for Tuesday, 10/23/2018 at 2:00 PM EST before Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Fri 09/28 12:54 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting (953) Assented to Motion to Extend Jurisdictional Briefing Deadlines in case 1:16-md-02753-LM and the respective pleading in the underlying civil cases. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) |
||
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extend Time
Mon 09/24 5:23 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Motion to Extend Jurisdictional Briefing Deadlines filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 09/12 4:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (Aytch, Enjolique) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
notice
Rescheduling Hearing Notice
Tue 09/11 5:24 PM
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CANCELLED. At the request of parties' lead counsel, the Telephone Status Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 3:00 PM EST is cancelled.(de) |
||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extend Time
Thu 08/30 11:27 AM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) |
|
order
Endorsed Order - not on motion
Thu 08/30 2:26 PM
ENDORSED ORDER re: 875 Notice of Subpoena in 16-md-2753-LM. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thu 08/30 3:28 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting (876) Motion to Extend Time JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE in case 1:16-md-02753-LM and the respective pleading in the underlying civil cases. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) |
||
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Transfer Order (In)
Thu 08/23 9:57 AM
ORDER MDL Transfer In No. CTO-10. Conditional transfer of case: New Jersey, 2:18-cv-11832. (de) |
|
notice
Hearing Notice
Thu 08/23 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 3:00 PM EST before Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) |
||
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Transcript
Mon 08/20 5:15 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Telephone Conference held on 8/16/2018. Court Reporter: Sandra Bailey, Telephone # 603 225-1454. Transcript is available for public inspection, but may not be copied or otherwise reproduced, at the Clerk's Office for a period of 90 days. Additionally, only attorneys of record and pro se parties with an ECF login and password who purchase a transcript from the court reporter will have access to the transcript through PACER during this 90-day period. If you would like to order a copy, please contact the court reporter at the above listed phone number. NOTICE: Any party who requests an original transcript has 21 days from service of this notice to determine whether it is necessary to redact any personal identifiers and, if so, to electronically file a Redaction Request. Redaction Request Follow Up 9/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Follow Up 9/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2018.(de) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 08/16 3:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Landya B. McCafferty. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/16/2018. (Court Reporter: Sandra Bailey) (Pltfs Attys: Jonathan Orent, David Selby, Susan Lowry, Adam Evans, Anne Schiavone) (Defts Attys: Enjolique Aytch, Pierre Chabot, Jack Friberg)(Total Hearing Time: 17 minutes) (de) |
||
order
Endorsed Order - not on motion
Wed 08/22 3:16 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: The court approves the request of the parties outlined in paragraph 3 of the joint agenda (doc. no. 842) to amend Section V. E. of the Plaintiff Fact Sheet in Amended Case Management Order 3G. Since the original order (doc. no. 135) and the amended order (doc. no. 135-1) included Exhibit C as part of the order, the entire order and all attachments (as amended) will be docketed in the original docket entry as Second Amended Case Management Order 3G (doc. no. 135-2). To be clear, document no. 135-2 is replacing document nos. 135 and 135-1. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) |
||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
order
Endorsed Order - not on motion
Mon 08/13 4:43 PM
ENDORSED ORDER re: 841 in 16-md-2753-LM and the respective pleadings in the civil cases JOINT MOTION TO AMEND PROCEDURAL ORDER AND TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de) |
||
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 08/09 5:55 PM
NOTICE of PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' JOINT AGENDA FOR THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 16, 2018 by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC.(Turner, Hugh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Revised Plaintiffs' Fact Sheet | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extend Time
Thu 08/09 5:38 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to JOINT MOTION TO AMEND PROCEDURAL ORDER AND TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 08/09 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Notice of Initial Discovery Pool Selections by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC.(Turner, Hugh) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice - ECF
Mon 07/30 3:22 PM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (mc) |
||
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - New Case
Fri 07/27 2:57 PM
NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1690894 filed by Erick Moore.(Schulte, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Mon 07/30 3:21 PM
Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-663-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) |