Nicole Vieira et al v. Mentor Worldwide, LLC et al.,
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-06502 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 23, 2019 12:31 AM PST |
Defendant
Mentor Worldwide, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
NuSil LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nusil Technology LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emilia Barozzi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Vieira
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Receipt
Wed 10/03 12:38 PM
Receipt of Receipt of of Copy of Remand Transmittal Form from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. BC711663, acknowledged on 9/13/2018 by Paul Cruz. (et) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Fri 09/07 3:20 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. (gk) |
|
43 | 43
order
Remand Case to State Court
Fri 09/07 3:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to remand27 . The matter is remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. BC711663. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) (gk) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
misc
For Judicial Notice
Thu 09/06 11:38 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 41 filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC.(Hanna, Monee) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 09/06 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Hanna, Monee) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Monee Takla Hanna, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
5
pgs
misc
For Judicial Notice
Wed 09/05 1:25 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 39 filed by Defendants NuSil LLC, Nusil Technology LLC.(Fassett, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 38 pgs Unredacted Document Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Letter FDA Approval Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Unredacted Document FDA Summary, | ||
Att: 4 Unredacted Document Federal Register | ||
39 | 39
29
pgs
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 09/05 1:16 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants NuSil LLC, Nusil Technology LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Fassett, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Dismiss | ||
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
misc
For Judicial Notice
Fri 08/31 5:06 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT filed by Plaintiffs Emilia Barozzi, Nicole Vieira.(Lenze, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
37 | 37
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Fri 08/31 5:04 PM
REPLY IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS REMAND MOTION filed by Plaintiffs Emilia Barozzi, Nicole Vieira. (Lenze, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Wed 08/29 2:12 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: First Amended Complaint filed 8/23/201831 . Per Local Rule 7.1-1, counsel shall immediately file the Certificate of Interested Parties. (gk) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 08/29 12:24 PM
Certificate & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Emilia Barozzi, Nicole Vieira, (Lenze, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 08/28 9:06 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/24 5:00 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court27 filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC.(Hanna, Monee) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Thomas Banigan, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
32 | 32
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 08/24 10:49 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DEEMING 1) DEFENDANT NUSIL LLC AND NUSIL TECHNOLOGY LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS (Dkt. No.18 ); 2) DEFENDANT MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (Dkt. No.20 ); and 3) PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF MONEE TAKLA HANNA FILED IN SUPPORT OF MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT(Dkt. No.26 ) AS MOOT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: In light of the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 31), Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Strike are DENIED as MOOT, and the hearing scheduled for September 14, 2018, is hereby VACATED as it relates to these motions, only. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court (Dkt. No.27 ) remains on calendar. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
37
pgs
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Thu 08/23 5:57 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Does, Mentor Worldwide, LLC, NuSil LLC, Nusil Technology LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Nicole Vieira, Emilia Barozzi(Lenze, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 08/21 12:46 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING 1) DEFENDANT MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT20 ; and 2) PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF MONEE TAKLA HANNA FILED IN SUPPORT OF MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT26 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. This Court, on its own motion, hereby CONTINUES the hearing date on these motions from August 31, 2018, to Friday, September 14, 2018, at 10:00 am before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/17 12:58 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF MONEE TAKLA HANNA FILED IN SUPPORT OF MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLCS RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS Declaration (Motion related),21 26 filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC.(Hanna, Monee) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
28 | 28
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Fri 08/17 12:53 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities 20 filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Hanna, Monee) |
|
27 | 27
22
pgs
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Fri 08/17 10:11 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Emilia Barozzi, Nicole Vieira. Motion set for hearing on 9/14/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Lenze, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Strike
Mon 08/13 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF MONEE TAKLA HANNA FILED IN SUPPORT OF MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLCS RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS Declaration (Motion related),21 filed by Plaintiff Emilia Barozzi, Nicole Vieira. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Lenze, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 08/13 4:42 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities 20 filed by Plaintiffs Emilia Barozzi, Nicole Vieira. (Lenze, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 08/08 11:19 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 08/06 10:10 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum 16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. This Motion is noticed for Monday, 9/10/2018 at 10:00 AM. Judge Birotte hears civil motions on Fridays at 10:00 AM. Clerk shall take this date off calendar as an Amended Notice of Motion was filed, document number 18, setting the matter for Friday, 9/14/2018 at 10:00 AM. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
For Judicial Notice
Fri 08/03 12:58 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities 20 filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC.(Hanna, Monee) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Fri 08/03 12:51 PM
DECLARATION of Monee Takla Hanna in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities 20 filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC.(Hanna, Monee) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 08/03 12:46 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Hanna, Monee) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
misc
For Judicial Notice
Fri 08/03 12:18 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum 18 filed by Defendants NuSil LLC, Nusil Technology LLC.(Fassett, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Unredacted Document Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Unredacted Document summary, | ||
Att: 4 Unredacted Document Federal Register | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 08/03 12:12 PM
Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum filed by Defendants NuSil LLC, Nusil Technology LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/14/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Fassett, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
misc
For Judicial Notice
Fri 08/03 11:41 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum 16 filed by Defendants NuSil LLC, Nusil Technology LLC.(Fassett, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Unredacted Document Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Unredacted Document Approval Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Unredacted Document Summary, | ||
Att: 4 Unredacted Document Federal Register | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 08/03 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Under Rule 12(b)(6); Memorandum filed by Defendants NuSil LLC, Nusil Technology LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Fassett, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 08/03 10:41 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)
Thu 08/02 5:22 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:18-cv-06502 AB(PLAx). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/02 3:14 PM
ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: GRANTING10 ,12 Non-Resident Attorney Dustin B Rawlin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Mentor Worldwide, LLC, designating Monee T Hanna as local counsel. (shb) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 08/01 2:24 PM
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dustin B. Rawlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 8/1/2018, Receipt No. 26BB79H7) filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Hanna, Monee) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice | ||
11 | 11
misc
Errata
Wed 08/01 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC. correcting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dustin B. Rawlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 8/1/2018, Receipt No. 26BB79H7)10 (Hanna, Monee) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 08/01 1:34 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dustin B. Rawlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 8/1/2018, Receipt No. 26BB79H7) filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Hanna, Monee) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice | ||
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 07/31 9:12 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nusil Technology LLC, identifying NuSil LLC, Avantor Inc., Mentor Worldwide LLC, Nicole Vieira, Emilia Barozzi. (Fassett, Melissa) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 07/31 9:06 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant NuSil LLC, (Fassett, Melissa) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 07/30 4:40 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 07/30 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (jp) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Joinder
Mon 07/30 3:46 PM
JOINDER filed by Defendant Nusil Technology LLC joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . (Fassett, Melissa) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Joinder
Mon 07/30 3:43 PM
JOINDER filed by Defendant NuSil LLC joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . (Fassett, Melissa) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 07/27 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC, (Hanna, Monee) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 07/27 2:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Hanna, Monee) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 07/27 2:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, case number BC711663 Receipt No: 0973-22161431 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Attorney Monee Takla Hanna added to party Mentor Worldwide, LLC(pty:dft))(Hanna, Monee) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Monee Takla Hanna in Support of Mentor Worldwide LLC's Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 07/30 5:22 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED COMPLAINT against Defendants Mentor Worldwide, LLC, NuSil LLC, Nusil Technology LLC., Does 1-100. Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Nicole Vieira. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 06/27/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 2 OF EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ). (jp) |