TUORTO v. HARENBERG et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Shipp |
Referred: | Lois H Goodman |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-12179 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 26, 2019 4:35 AM EST |
Defendant
ABC CORP. 1-10
|
|
Defendant
AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOANNE L. HARENBERG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10
|
|
Notice Only
PHV STEPHANIE R. REISS
|
|
Plaintiff
KAREN J. TUORTO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 04/30 6:45 PM
ORDER granting7 Deft AWWC's Motion to Dismiss; that Counts One and Two are dismissed with prejudice; terminating18 Deft Harenberg's Motion to Dismiss; that Count Three is dismissed without prejudice; closing case. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/30/2019. (gxh) |
|
21 | 21
13
pgs
order
Opinion
Tue 04/30 6:42 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/30/2019. (gxh) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 04/30 6:46 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (gxh) |
||
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
Mon 10/29 5:33 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. re7 MOTION to Dismiss (ROSENBLATT, RICHARD) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 10/29 4:39 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re18 Cross MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of Plaintiff's Complaint (cross-motion returnable 11-5-18 and supporting brief was filed on the docket in entry 17 ) (TRINITY, JOSEPH) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss
Tue 10/23 2:28 PM
Cross MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of Plaintiff's Complaint (cross-motion returnable 11-5-18 and supporting brief was filed on the docket in entry 17 ) by JOANNE L. HARENBERG. Responses due by 10/29/2018(DIFAZIO, SALVATORE) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion | ||
qc
QC - Motion - Cross Motion
Tue 10/23 11:43 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The17 Response in Opposition submitted by Salvatore DiFazio on 10/22/2018 contains a Cross-Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CROSS-MOTION USING THE CORRECT EVENT MOTION in order to have the Motion placed on the Court`s calendar. Counsel is only to re-file the Motion and may refer to the supporting documents as being filed on the docket in entry17 . This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/23 2:43 PM
Set Deadlines as to18 Cross MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of Plaintiff's Complaint (cross-motion returnable 11-5-18 and supporting brief was filed on the docket in entry 17 ) . Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/23 2:44 PM
Reset Deadlines as to18 Cross MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of Plaintiff's Complaint (cross-motion returnable 11-5-18 and supporting brief was filed on the docket in entry 17 ) . Motion reset for 11/5/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) |
||
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 10/22 4:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JOANNE L. HARENBERG re7 MOTION to Dismiss (DIFAZIO, SALVATORE) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Cross-Motion to Dismiss Count Three or in the Alternative Remand it to State Court | ||
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Tue 10/16 4:44 PM
Letter from Rudolph Burshnic to Judge Shipp re ECF7 re7 MOTION to Dismiss . (BURSHNIC, RUDOLPH) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Mon 10/15 1:44 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re7 MOTION to Dismiss (TRINITY, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C | ||
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/27 12:22 PM
LETTER ORDER granting request for an adjournment of one cycle as to the7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/27/2018. (mps) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 09/27 12:23 PM
Reset Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 11/5/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) |
||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Wed 09/26 2:11 PM
Letter from Joseph F. Trinity, Esq.. (TRINITY, JOSEPH) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Wed 09/19 1:03 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stephanie Reiss to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9034546.) (ROSENBLATT, RICHARD) |
|
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Wed 09/19 2:35 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEPHANIE R. REISS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps) |
||
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/18 9:00 AM
CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Stephanie R. Reiss, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 9/18/2018. (mps) |
|
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 09/13 9:06 AM
Reset Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 10/15/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) |
||
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Letter Rule 7.1
Wed 09/12 2:37 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by JOANNE L. HARENBERG re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant, American Water Works (DIFAZIO, SALVATORE) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 09/10 2:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.. (ROSENBLATT, RICHARD) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/06 4:39 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses by JOANNE L. HARENBERG.(DIFAZIO, SALVATORE) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Thu 09/06 3:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC.. Responses due by 9/17/2018(ROSENBLATT, RICHARD) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Andy Markwardt, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andy Markwardt, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Andy Markwardt | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 09/06 3:19 PM
Set Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) |
||
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/05 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RUDOLPH J. BURSHNIC on behalf of AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. (BURSHNIC, RUDOLPH) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Fri 08/24 8:55 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JOANNE L. HARENBERG has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/6/2018. (mps) |
||
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Thu 08/23 2:19 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Joanne L. Harenberg.. (DIFAZIO, SALVATORE) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Wed 08/22 12:32 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (ROSENBLATT, RICHARD) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Wed 08/22 3:36 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/6/2018. (mps) |
||
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 08/17 9:53 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint CCS and Summons served on American Water and Joanne Harenberg on August 2, 2018, filed by KAREN J. TUORTO.(TRINITY, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service J. Harenberg Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/30 2:11 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC., JOANNE L. HARENBERG. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/30 12:49 PM
COMPLAINT against AMERICAN WATER WORKS COMPANY, INC., JOANNE L. HARENBERG, JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORP. 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8916765) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KAREN J. TUORTO.(TRINITY, JOSEPH) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
qc
QC - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 07/30 1:07 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/30 2:10 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jem) |